04.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] |
27.09.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] |
14.06.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] |
17.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] |
09.11.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] |
24.08.2012 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 26.09.2012 [2012/39] |
03.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] |
27.07.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] |
20.07.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] |
13.07.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] |
08.06.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2012 [2012/28] |
11.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] |
16.09.2011 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 19.10.2011 [2011/42] |
12.09.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
12.09.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
19.04.2011 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
15.03.2011 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
04.01.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.12.2010 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
17.09.2010 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 20.10.2010 [2010/42] |
16.03.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
05.01.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.10.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.09.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.05.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] |
06.04.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
07.01.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.12.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.07.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] |
11.01.2008 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] |
28.12.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
12.12.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.07.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.07.2007 |
First examination report |
|
08.06.2007 |
Change - applicant |
published on 11.07.2007 [2007/28] |
02.03.2007 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 04.04.2007 [2007/14] |
09.02.2007 |
Change - representative |
published on 14.03.2007 [2007/11] |
20.12.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.01.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.08.2005 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
12.08.2005 |
Change - extension states |
published on 28.09.2005 [2005/39] |
29.07.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.07.2005 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.09.2005 [2005/37] |
29.07.2005 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 14.09.2005 [2005/37] |
27.07.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.07.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.07.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.02.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.06.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.04.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|