Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9678085 | Global Dossier | 13.06.2017 | B2 | US2014206021 | 24.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3591708 | 22.02.2008 | US72733503 | 03.12.2003 | US201314069052 | 31.10.2013 | US43042302 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8604161 | Global Dossier | 10.12.2013 | B2 | US2008268474 | 30.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3591708 | 22.02.2008 | US72733503 | 03.12.2003 | US43042302 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7863411 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2011 | B2 | US2004229280 | 18.11.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US72733503 | 03.12.2003 | US43042302 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4485367B | Global Dossier | 23.06.2010 | B2 | JP2006509013 | 16.03.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US0338343 | 03.12.2003 | US43042302 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL206129 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US0338343 | 03.12.2003 | US43042302 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2317317 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2014 | B1 | EP2317317 | 04.05.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP03808431 | 03.12.2003 | US43042302 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2312318 | Global Dossier | 08.10.2014 | B1 | EP2312318 | 20.04.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP03808431 | 03.12.2003 | US43042302 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1953551 | Global Dossier | 19.02.2014 | B1 | EP1953551 | 18.03.2009 | A3 | EP1953551 | 06.08.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP03808431 | 03.12.2003 | US43042302 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2836951 | Global Dossier | 10.01.2017 | C | CA2836951 | 17.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2507936 | 03.12.2003 | US43042302 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2010201499B | Global Dossier | 07.02.2013 | B2 | AU2010201499 | 06.05.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2003302500 | 03.12.2003 | AU2010201499 | 15.04.2010 | US0338343 | 03.12.2003 | US43042302 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003302500B | Global Dossier | 29.04.2010 | B2 | AU2003302500 | 23.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0338343 | 03.12.2003 | US43042302 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1573323 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2011 | B1 | EP1573323 | 04.04.2007 | A4 | EP1573323 | 14.09.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US0338343 | 03.12.2003 | US43042302 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE529744T | 15.11.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US0338343 | 03.12.2003 | US43042302 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2507936 | 25.02.2014 | C | CA2507936 | 17.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0338343 | 03.12.2003 | US43042302 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102297798B | 18.11.2015 | B | CN102297798 | 28.12.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | CN200380109043 | 03.12.2003 | US43042302 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1739029B | 22.06.2011 | B | CN1739029 | 22.02.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US0338343 | 03.12.2003 | US43042302 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1573323T | 23.01.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US0338343 | 03.12.2003 | US43042302 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1953551T | 12.05.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP03808431 | 03.12.2003 | US43042302 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2312318T | 12.01.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP03808431 | 03.12.2003 | US43042302 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2317317T | 02.03.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP03808431 | 03.12.2003 | US43042302 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2375958T | 07.03.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US0338343 | 03.12.2003 | US43042302 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1088948 | 17.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0338343 | 03.12.2003 | US43042302 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL168904 | 30.11.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US0338343 | 03.12.2003 | US43042302 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL200468 | 28.06.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | IL20046809 | 18.08.2009 | US0338343 | 03.12.2003 | US43042302 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA05005920 | 17.03.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US0338343 | 03.12.2003 | US43042302 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ540417 | 30.04.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US0338343 | 03.12.2003 | US43042302 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004050851 | Global Dossier | 27.01.2005 | A3 | WO2004050851 | 17.06.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US43042302 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102241741B | 13.11.2013 | B | CN102241741 | 16.11.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US43042302 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2460641T | 14.05.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US43042302 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2527408T | 23.01.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US43042302 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2531926T | 20.03.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US43042302 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1124388 | 10.07.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US43042302 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1157009 | 22.06.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US43042302 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1157010 | 22.06.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US43042302 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX337569 | 09.03.2016 | B | Priority number | Date | US43042302 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ560410 | 24.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US43042302 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ572892 | 26.03.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US43042302 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1573323E | 10.01.2012 | E | Priority number | Date | US43042302 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1953551E | 06.05.2014 | E | Priority number | Date | US43042302 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2312318E | 14.01.2015 | E | Priority number | Date | US43042302 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2317317E | 02.03.2015 | E | Priority number | Date | US43042302 | 03.12.2002 | Type | Divisional application | EP1953551 | EP2317317 | EP2312318 |