EP1573323 - PRION PROTEIN LIGANDS AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pathogen Removal and Diagnostic Technologies, Inc. 1 Rodney Square Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | For all designated states NORTH CAROLINA STATE UNIVERSITY 2401 Research Drive, Suite 1122 Raleigh, NC 27695-8212 / US | [2011/42] |
Former [2007/28] | For all designated states Pathogen Removal and Diagnostic Technologies, Inc. 1 Rodney Square Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | ||
For all designated states NORTH CAROLINA STATE UNIVERSITY 2401 Research Drive, Suite 1122 Raleigh, NC 27695-8212 / US | |||
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states The American National Red Cross Holland Laboratory, 15601 Crabbs Branch Way Rockville, MD 20855 / US | ||
For all designated states NORTH CAROLINA STATE UNIVERSITY 2401 Research Drive, Suite 1122 Raleigh, NC 27695-8212 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMMOND, David, J. 4916 Ripplemead Court Laytonsville, MD 20882 / US | 02 /
LATHROP, Julia, T. 1000 Poplar Drive Falls Church, VA 22046 / US | 03 /
CERVENAKOVA, Larisa 15 Welwyn Way Rockville, MD 20850 / US | 04 /
CARBONELL, Ruben, G. 6105 Godfrey Drive Raleigh, NC 27612 / US | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Adamson Jones Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/42] | Adamson Jones BioCity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham Nottinghamshire NG1 1GF / GB | ||
Former [2009/27] | Adamson Jones BioCity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham NG1 1GF / GB | ||
Former [2008/34] | Hutter, Anton, et al AdamsonJones BioCity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham NG1 1GF / GB | ||
Former [2007/11] | Hutter, Anton, et al AdamsonJones BioCity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham NG1 1GF / GB | ||
Former [2005/37] | White, Nina Louise, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 03808431.5 | 03.12.2003 | [2005/37] | WO2003US38343 | Priority number, date | US20020430423P | 03.12.2002 Original published format: US 430423 P | [2005/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004050851 | Date: | 17.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1573323 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1573323 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.01.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/53, G01N33/543, G01N33/567, C07K16/00, A61K39/395 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
G01N33/6896 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
C07K5/0808 (EP,US);
C07K5/081 (EP,US);
C07K5/0812 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/37] | Extension states | AL | 03.08.2005 | LT | 03.08.2005 | LV | 03.08.2005 | MK | 03.08.2005 | Title | German: | PRIONPROTEINLIGANDEN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER VERWENDUNG | [2005/37] | English: | PRION PROTEIN LIGANDS AND METHODS OF USE | [2005/37] | French: | LIGANDS DE PROTEINE PRION ET PROCEDES D'UTILISATION | [2005/37] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2005 | Search fee paid | 01.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 17.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.05.2011 | 02.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 07.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08150151.2 / EP1953551 | EP10176707.7 / EP2317317 | EP10176708.5 / EP2312318 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.07.2007 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 19.10.2011 | CZ | 19.10.2011 | EE | 19.10.2011 | FI | 19.10.2011 | HU | 19.10.2011 | RO | 19.10.2011 | SI | 19.10.2011 | SK | 19.10.2011 | TR | 19.10.2011 | LU | 03.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | BG | 19.01.2012 | GR | 04.07.2012 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
FI | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
TR | 19.10.2011 | ||
LU | 03.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 04.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
FI | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
LU | 03.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 04.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
LU | 03.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 04.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 04.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | SI | 19.10.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [DXA]WO0177687 (VI TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [DX] 20-37 * page 8, line 25 - line 30 * * page 14, line 20 - page 16, line 18 * * claims 22-24,27-29,40,41,45-47 * * the whole document * [A] 9-12; | [A] - CHIARINI LUCIANA B ET AL, "Cellular prion protein transduces neuroprotective signals", EMBO (EUROPEAN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY ORGANIZATION) JOURNAL, (20020701), vol. 21, no. 13, ISSN 0261-4189, pages 3317 - 3326, XP002389018 [A] * page 3322, column R, paragraph 2 * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/emboj/cdf324 | [A] - SCHMITT-ULMS G ET AL, "Binding of neural cell adhesion molecules (N-CAMs) to the cellular prion protein.", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY. 14 DEC 2001, (20011214), vol. 314, no. 5, ISSN 0022-2836, pages 1209 - 1225, XP000473354 [A] * abstract * * page 1215, column R, paragraphs 2,3 * | [A] - WINDL O ET AL, "A candidate marsupial PrP gene reveals two domains conserved in mammalian PrP proteins", GENE 1995 NETHERLANDS, (1995), vol. 159, no. 2, ISSN 0378-1119, pages 181 - 186, XP004042203 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(95)00064-D | International search | [Y]US6379905 (FISHLEIGH ROBERT VINCENT [GB], et al); | [A] - SCHAETZL ET AL., "Prion protein gene variation among primates", J. MOL. BIOL., (1995), vol. 245, pages 362 - 374, XP002903182 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.1994.0030 | by applicant | US5750361 | US5808011 | US5834318 | WO0177687 | - INGROSSO, L. ET AL., "Congo red prolongs the incubation period in scrapie-infected hamsters", J. VIROLOGY, (1995), vol. 69, pages 506 - 508 | - TAGLIAVINI, F. ET AL., "Effectiveness of anthracycline against experimental prion diseases in Syrian hamsters", SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 276, doi:doi:10.1126/science.276.5315.1119, pages 1119 - 1122, XP002043060 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.276.5315.1119 | - PRIOLA, S.A. ET AL., "Porphyrin and Phthalocyanine antiscrapie compounds", SCIENCE, (2000), vol. 287, pages 1503 - 1506 | - STOCKEL ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1998), vol. 37, pages 7185 - 7193 | - SOTO, C. ET AL., "Reversion of prion protein conformational changes in synthetic 0-sheet breaker peptides", LANCET, (2000), vol. 355, doi:doi:10.1016/S0140-6736(99)11419-3, pages 192 - 197, XP004813317 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(99)11419-3 | - CAUGHEY, B. ET AL., "Binding of the Protease-sensitive form of prion protein PrP to Sulphated Glycosaminoglycan and Congo Red", J. VIROLOGY, (1994), vol. 68, pages 2135 - 2141, XP002056076 | - KASCSAK, R.J. ET AL., IMMUNODIAGNOSIS OF PRION DISEASE, IMMUNOLOGICAL INVEST, (1997), vol. 26, pages 259 - 268 | - FISCHER, M.B. ET AL., "Binding of disease-associated prion protein to plasminogen.", NATURE, (2000), vol. 408, doi:doi:10.1038/35044100, pages 479 - 483, XP002520611 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35044100 |