EP1552172 - SLIDING BEARING MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2008 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Pampus GmbH Am Nordkanal 37 47877 Willich / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/28] | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Pampus Gmbh Am Nordkanal 37 47877 Willich / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WÖLKI, Peter Azaleenweg 1 41189 Mönchengladbach / DE | 02 /
HARIG, Friedrich Knickelsdorf 69 47877 Willich / DE | 03 /
HAARDT, Heinz Kondorstr. 7 41352 Korschenbroich / DE | [2005/28] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2005/28] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 03808711.0 | 08.10.2003 | [2005/28] | WO2003EP11095 | Priority number, date | DE2002147830 | 14.10.2002 Original published format: DE 10247830 | [2005/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004036066 | Date: | 29.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1552172 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1552172 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16C33/20, B32B7/00, B32B15/00 | [2005/28] | CPC: |
F16C33/28 (EP,US);
F16C33/20 (KR);
B32B15/00 (KR);
B32B7/00 (KR);
Y10T428/12479 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12493 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLEITLAGERMATERIAL | [2005/28] | English: | SLIDING BEARING MATERIAL | [2005/28] | French: | MATERIAU DE PALIER A GLISSEMENT | [2005/28] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 02.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.01.2008 | CZ | 02.01.2008 | DK | 02.01.2008 | EE | 02.01.2008 | FI | 02.01.2008 | GB | 02.01.2008 | IE | 02.01.2008 | IT | 02.01.2008 | NL | 02.01.2008 | RO | 02.01.2008 | SI | 02.01.2008 | SK | 02.01.2008 | TR | 02.01.2008 | BG | 02.04.2008 | SE | 02.04.2008 | GR | 03.04.2008 | ES | 13.04.2008 | PT | 02.06.2008 | HU | 03.07.2008 | [2010/49] |
Former [2010/37] | CY | 02.01.2008 | |
CZ | 02.01.2008 | ||
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
EE | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
GB | 02.01.2008 | ||
IE | 02.01.2008 | ||
IT | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
RO | 02.01.2008 | ||
SI | 02.01.2008 | ||
SK | 02.01.2008 | ||
TR | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
HU | 03.07.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 02.01.2008 | |
CZ | 02.01.2008 | ||
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
EE | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
GB | 02.01.2008 | ||
IE | 02.01.2008 | ||
IT | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
RO | 02.01.2008 | ||
SI | 02.01.2008 | ||
SK | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
HU | 03.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/40] | CY | 02.01.2008 | |
CZ | 02.01.2008 | ||
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
EE | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
GB | 02.01.2008 | ||
IE | 02.01.2008 | ||
IT | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
RO | 02.01.2008 | ||
SI | 02.01.2008 | ||
SK | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CY | 02.01.2008 | |
CZ | 02.01.2008 | ||
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
EE | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
GB | 02.01.2008 | ||
IE | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
RO | 02.01.2008 | ||
SI | 02.01.2008 | ||
SK | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 02.01.2008 | |
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
EE | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
GB | 02.01.2008 | ||
IE | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
RO | 02.01.2008 | ||
SI | 02.01.2008 | ||
SK | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/04] | CZ | 02.01.2008 | |
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
GB | 02.01.2008 | ||
IE | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
RO | 02.01.2008 | ||
SI | 02.01.2008 | ||
SK | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | CZ | 02.01.2008 | |
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
IE | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
RO | 02.01.2008 | ||
SI | 02.01.2008 | ||
SK | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | DK | 02.01.2008 | |
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
IE | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
SI | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | DK | 02.01.2008 | |
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
SI | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | FI | 02.01.2008 | |
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
SI | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 02.01.2008 | |
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
SI | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | FI | 02.01.2008 | |
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
SI | 02.01.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/27] | NL | 02.01.2008 | |
SI | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | SI | 02.01.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2001323115 ; | [DA]US5229198 (SCHROEDER ROBERT [US]) [DA] 1 * claim 1 *; | [X]US5686176 (ADAM ACHIM [DE], et al) [X] 1,3-6,9,15-17 * claims 1,2,7-10 * * column 1, line 57 - line 64 * * example 1 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2002, no. 39, Database accession no. 2002-354747, XP002284799 & JP2001323115 A 20011120 (OILESS IND CO LTD) [A] 2 * abstract * |