EP1559022 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR RECEIVE QUEUE PROVISIONING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2017 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 5300 California Avenue Irvine, CA 92617 / US | [2007/21] |
Former [2005/31] | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 16215 Alton Parkway Irvine, California 92618 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELZUR, Uri 21 Sunlight Irvine, CA 92612 / US | [2005/31] | Representative(s) | Jehle, Volker Armin, et al Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | Jehle, Volker Armin, et al Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/41] | Jehle, Volker Armin Patentanwälte Bosch, Graf von Stosch, Jehle Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/31] | Jehle, Volker Armin, Dipl.-Ing. Bosch, Graf von Stosch, Jehle, Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03809133.6 | 17.10.2003 | [2005/31] | WO2003US33015 | Priority number, date | US20020419354P | 18.10.2002 Original published format: US 419354 P | US20020420901P | 24.10.2002 Original published format: US 420901 P | US20030439951P | 14.01.2003 Original published format: US 439951 P | US20030442360P | 24.01.2003 Original published format: US 442360 P | [2005/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004036381 | Date: | 29.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1559022 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1559022 | Date: | 14.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.06.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/863 | [2016/25] | CPC: |
H04L49/9036 (EP,US);
H04L47/621 (EP,US);
H04L49/90 (EP,US);
H04L69/16 (EP,US);
H04L69/32 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/01] | G06F13/28, H04L12/56 | ||
Former IPC [2005/31] | G06F13/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2016/50] |
Former [2006/06] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2005/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUREMPFANGSWARTESCHLANGENPROVISIONIERUNG | [2005/31] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR RECEIVE QUEUE PROVISIONING | [2005/31] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'ALIMENTER DES FILES D'ATTENTE DE RECEPTION | [2005/31] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2005 | Search fee paid | 18.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/31] | 15.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.02.2008 | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5916307 (PISKIEL HAROLD ARON [US], et al) [A] 1-10* column 1, line 25 - column 21, line 67 *; | [X]WO0041365 (MICROSOFT CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 12, line 20 - page 49, line 7; figures 1-3(a) *; | [A]WO0072142 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 8, line 25 - page 36, line 2 *; | [X]US2002055993 (SHAH HEMAL V [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0136]; figures 1A-7 *; | [X]US2002141424 (GASBARRO DOMINIC J [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0089] * | International search | [A]US5958017 (SCOTT STEVEN L [US], et al); | [AP]US6611883 (AVERY JAMES M [US]); | [A] - MISHRA P., SAKSENA M., "Designing buffer management ppolicies at an IP/ATM gateway", ATM WORKSHOP PROCEEDINGS, IEEE, (199805), pages 144 - 153, XP010280505 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ATM.1998.675154 |