EP1562830 - PROTECTIVE PACKAGE FOR CUSHIONING OBJECT WITH CIRCULAR CONTOUR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2013 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ESSILOR INTERNATIONAL (Compagnie Générale d'Optique) 147, rue de Paris 94220 Charenton-le-Pont / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/11] | For all designated states ESSILOR INTERNATIONAL (Compagnie Générale d'Optique) 147, rue de Paris F-94220 Charenton-le-Pont / FR | ||
Former [2005/33] | For all designated states ESSILOR INTERNATIONAL (Compagnie Générale d'Optique) 147, rue de Paris F-94220 Charenton-le-Pont / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHOTT, Guy 69, rue de Strasbourg F-55500 Ligny En Barrois / FR | 02 /
CLERC, Marie-Amélie Bâtiment C 2 rue Louis Thevenet F-69004 Lyon / FR | [2012/11] |
Former [2005/33] | 01 /
SCHOTT, Guy 69, rue de Strasbourg F-55500 Ligny En Barrois / FR | ||
02 /
CLERC, Marie-Amélie Bâtiment C, 2 rue Louis Thevenet F-69004 Lyon / FR | Representative(s) | Lepelletier-Beaufond, François, et al Santarelli 49, avenue des Champs Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/11] | Lepelletier-Beaufond, François, et al Santarelli 14 avenue de la Grande-Armée 75017 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2005/33] | Lepelletier-Beaufond, François, et al Santarelli 14 avenue de la Grande-Armée 75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 03809198.9 | 13.11.2003 | [2005/33] | WO2003FR03369 | Priority number, date | FR20020014555 | 20.11.2002 Original published format: FR 0214555 | [2005/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004050488 | Date: | 17.06.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1562830 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1562830 | Date: | 14.03.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/50, B65D85/38 | [2005/33] | CPC: |
B65D5/5021 (EP,US);
B65D85/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/33] | Title | German: | SCHUTZVERPACKUNG FÜR POLSTEROBJEKT MIT KREISFÖRMIGER KONTUR | [2011/45] | English: | PROTECTIVE PACKAGE FOR CUSHIONING OBJECT WITH CIRCULAR CONTOUR | [2005/33] | French: | EMBALLAGE DE PROTECTION ET DE CALAGE POUR OBJET CONTOUR CIRCULAIRE | [2005/33] |
Former [2005/33] | SCHUTZVERPACKUNG F R POLSTEROBJEKT MIT KREISF RMIGER KONTUR | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/33] | 15.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.04.2008 | Opposition(s) | 17.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.11.2003 | AT | 14.03.2012 | CY | 14.03.2012 | CZ | 14.03.2012 | DK | 14.03.2012 | EE | 14.03.2012 | FI | 14.03.2012 | NL | 14.03.2012 | RO | 14.03.2012 | SE | 14.03.2012 | SI | 14.03.2012 | SK | 14.03.2012 | TR | 14.03.2012 | BG | 14.06.2012 | GR | 15.06.2012 | PT | 16.07.2012 | IE | 13.11.2012 | LU | 13.11.2012 | BE | 30.11.2012 | CH | 30.11.2012 | LI | 30.11.2012 | MC | 30.11.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 14.03.2012 | |
CY | 14.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
DK | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
NL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
TR | 14.03.2012 | ||
BG | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
IE | 13.11.2012 | ||
LU | 13.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 14.03.2012 | |
CY | 14.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
DK | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
NL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
TR | 14.03.2012 | ||
BG | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
IE | 13.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 14.03.2012 | |
CY | 14.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
DK | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
NL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
BG | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
IE | 13.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 14.03.2012 | |
CY | 14.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
DK | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
NL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
BG | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 14.03.2012 | |
CY | 14.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
DK | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
NL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
BG | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 14.03.2012 | |
CY | 14.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
DK | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
NL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 14.03.2012 | |
CY | 14.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 14.03.2012 | |
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | GR | 15.06.2012 | Cited in | International search | [XAY]DE2636454 (SCHROEDER & WAGNER) [X] 16,17,19 * the whole document * [A] 8,10 [Y] 18,20,21; | [YX]FR2610601 (CLERGEAU PAPETERIES LEON [FR]) [Y] 12-14,18 * the whole document * [X] 1-3; | [Y]DE9307318U (EUROPA CARTON) [Y] 4,5 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9424004 (ESSILOR INT [FR], et al) [A] 1-22* the whole document *; | [XY]DE4414131 (SCHOCK OTTO [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,7,9,11,22 * the whole document * [Y] 4,5,12-15; | [YX]EP0693428 (FCP FINANC CARTON PAPIER [FR]) [Y] 15,20,21 * the whole document * [X] 1-3; | [X]US5529187 (DENOLA ROBERT C [US]) [X] 1-5,16,22 * column W * | by applicant | FR2703654 |