EP1558101 - RESILIENT HEEL FOR SHOES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Caprice Schuhproduktion GmbH & Co. KG Blocksbergstrasse 158 66955 Pirmasens / DE | [2005/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CÖLSCH, Kurt Am Nussbaum 10 66954 Pirmasens / DE | [2005/31] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Dr. Keller, Schwertfeger Partnerschaft mbB Westring 17 76829 Landau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/31] | Patentanwälte Möll und Bitterich Westring 17 76829 Landau/Pfalz / DE | Application number, filing date | 03809248.2 | 20.05.2003 | [2005/31] | WO2003EP05280 | Priority number, date | DE2002216529U | 26.10.2002 Original published format: DE 20216529 U | [2005/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004037033 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1558101 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1558101 | Date: | 06.12.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A43B21/26, A43B21/42, A43B21/46 | [2005/31] | CPC: |
A43B21/26 (EP);
A43B21/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FEDERNDER ABSATZ FÜR SCHUHE | [2005/31] | English: | RESILIENT HEEL FOR SHOES | [2005/31] | French: | TALON ELASTIQUE DESTINE A DES CHAUSSURES | [2005/31] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/31] | 18.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 06.12.2006 | DK | 06.12.2006 | EE | 06.12.2006 | FI | 06.12.2006 | RO | 06.12.2006 | SI | 06.12.2006 | SK | 06.12.2006 | TR | 06.12.2006 | SE | 06.03.2007 | GR | 07.03.2007 | ES | 17.03.2007 | PT | 07.05.2007 | LU | 20.05.2007 | CH | 31.05.2007 | LI | 31.05.2007 | MC | 31.05.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/40] | CY | 06.12.2006 | |
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
EE | 06.12.2006 | ||
FI | 06.12.2006 | ||
RO | 06.12.2006 | ||
SI | 06.12.2006 | ||
SK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.03.2007 | ||
GR | 07.03.2007 | ||
ES | 17.03.2007 | ||
PT | 07.05.2007 | ||
LU | 20.05.2007 | ||
CH | 31.05.2007 | ||
LI | 31.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | DK | 06.12.2006 | |
EE | 06.12.2006 | ||
FI | 06.12.2006 | ||
RO | 06.12.2006 | ||
SI | 06.12.2006 | ||
SK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.03.2007 | ||
GR | 07.03.2007 | ||
ES | 17.03.2007 | ||
PT | 07.05.2007 | ||
CH | 31.05.2007 | ||
LI | 31.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | DK | 06.12.2006 | |
FI | 06.12.2006 | ||
RO | 06.12.2006 | ||
SI | 06.12.2006 | ||
SK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.03.2007 | ||
GR | 07.03.2007 | ||
ES | 17.03.2007 | ||
PT | 07.05.2007 | ||
CH | 31.05.2007 | ||
LI | 31.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | DK | 06.12.2006 | |
FI | 06.12.2006 | ||
RO | 06.12.2006 | ||
SI | 06.12.2006 | ||
SK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.03.2007 | ||
ES | 17.03.2007 | ||
PT | 07.05.2007 | ||
CH | 31.05.2007 | ||
LI | 31.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | DK | 06.12.2006 | |
FI | 06.12.2006 | ||
RO | 06.12.2006 | ||
SI | 06.12.2006 | ||
SK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.03.2007 | ||
ES | 17.03.2007 | ||
PT | 07.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | DK | 06.12.2006 | |
FI | 06.12.2006 | ||
RO | 06.12.2006 | ||
SI | 06.12.2006 | ||
SK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.03.2007 | ||
ES | 17.03.2007 | ||
PT | 07.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | FI | 06.12.2006 | |
RO | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.03.2007 | ||
ES | 17.03.2007 | ||
PT | 07.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | FI | 06.12.2006 | |
SE | 06.03.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE465675 (ERNST MOLKENTIN, et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,10,12 * the whole document *; | [X]GB329196 (COLIN THOMPSON ARBUTHNOT SHEAR) [X] 1,9,12 * page 1, line 81 - page 2, line 95; figure 1 *; | [Y]CH347102 (FITZ ON HEEL CORP [US]) [Y] 11* figure - *; | [Y]US4819344 (SCHUELLER GUENTER [DE]) [Y] 11 * column 2, lines 48-51; figure - *; | [X]US5063691 (HAUG RICHARD J [US]) [X] 1,5,6,9,10,12-14 * column 2, line 49 - column 4, line 63; figures 9,10 * |