EP1552037 - METHOD FOR REMOVING A LAYER AREA OF A COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | For all designated states OT Oberflächentechnik GmbH & Co. KG Werkstrasse 4 19061 Schwerin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
For all designated states OT Oberflächentechnik GmbH & Co. KG Werkstrasse 4 19061 Schwerin / DE | |||
Former [2007/32] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
For all designated states OT Oberflächentechnik GmbH & Co. KG Werkstrasse 4 19061 Schwerin / DE | |||
Former [2006/45] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/28] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OTT, Michael Hornhof 12 45478 Mülheim an der Ruhr / DE | 02 /
REICHE, Ralph Bulgenbachweg 15 13465 Berlin / DE | 03 /
COX, Nigel-Philip Gipsstrasse 23 B 10119 Berlin / DE | 04 /
MAIER, Uta Fritz-Reuter-Strasse 40 19053 Schwerin / DE | 05 /
ZIMMER, Ronald Burgstallstrasse 17b 90587 Obermichelbach / DE | [2005/28] | Application number, filing date | 03809256.5 | 20.08.2003 | [2005/28] | WO2003EP09235 | Priority number, date | EP20020023394 | 18.10.2002 Original published format: EP 02023394 | [2005/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004038068 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1552037 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1552037 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C23G1/32, C23F1/44, F01D5/00 | [2005/28] | CPC: |
F01D5/005 (EP,US);
C23F1/44 (EP,US);
C23G1/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2006/06] |
Former [2005/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ENTFERNEN EINES SCHICHTBEREICHS EINES BAUTEILS | [2005/28] | English: | METHOD FOR REMOVING A LAYER AREA OF A COMPONENT | [2005/28] | French: | PROCEDE D'ELIMINATION D'UNE ZONE PELLICULAIRE D'UN ELEMENT CONSTITUTIF | [2005/28] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 23.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06020613.3 / EP1752562 | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2002074017 (SCHILBE JOHN E [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * paragraphs [0015] , [0017] , [0023] - [0027]; figure -; claim - *; | [Y]JPS61199085 ; | [Y]US2710271 (BUCKE FERNSLER EDWARD, et al) [Y] 1,4,5 * example - *; | [Y]US5575858 (CHEN OTIS Y [SG], et al) [Y] 1-14 * column 2, line 61 - column 4, line 47; figure 3; claim - *; | [A]EP1213370 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-14 * example -; claim - *; | [DA]US5944909 (REEVES JIM D [US], et al) [DA] 1-14 * column 4, lines 10-22; claim - *; | [A]US6132520 (SCHILBE JOHN E [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 1, line 26 - line 31; claim - * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1986, no. 42, Database accession no. 1986-274660, XP002228489 & JPS61199085 A 19860903 (MIYATA KOGYO KK) [Y] 1,2,6 * abstract * |