EP1554544 - METHOD FOR ELECTRONICALLY ADJUSTING THE READOUT OSCILLATION FREQUENCY OF A CORIOLIS GYRO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LITEF GmbH Lörracher Strasse 18 79115 Freiburg / DE | [2005/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHRÖDER, Werner Büsägestr. 14 77955 Ettenheim / DE | [2005/29] | Representative(s) | Müller, Frithjof E. Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/29] | Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing. Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03809270.6 | 07.10.2003 | [2005/29] | WO2003EP11090 | Priority number, date | DE2002148735 | 18.10.2002 Original published format: DE 10248735 | [2005/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004038333 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1554544 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1554544 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01C19/56 | [2005/29] | CPC: |
G01C19/5776 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/29] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ELEKTRONISCHEN ABSTIMMUNG DER AUSLESESCHWINGUNGSFREQUENZ EINES CORIOLISKREISELS | [2005/29] | English: | METHOD FOR ELECTRONICALLY ADJUSTING THE READOUT OSCILLATION FREQUENCY OF A CORIOLIS GYRO | [2005/29] | French: | PROCEDE DE SYNTONISATION ELECTRONIQUE DE LA FREQUENCE D'OSCILLATION DE SORTIE D'UN GYROSCOPE VIBRANT | [2005/29] | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/29] | 19.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.06.2006 | EE | 28.06.2006 | NL | 28.06.2006 | RO | 28.06.2006 | SI | 28.06.2006 | SK | 28.06.2006 | BG | 28.09.2006 | DK | 28.09.2006 | GR | 29.09.2006 | AT | 07.10.2006 | CZ | 07.10.2006 | LU | 07.10.2006 | ES | 09.10.2006 | BE | 31.10.2006 | MC | 31.10.2006 | PT | 28.11.2006 | HU | 29.12.2006 | [2009/40] |
Former [2009/03] | CY | 28.06.2006 | |
EE | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
RO | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
BG | 28.09.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
GR | 29.09.2006 | ||
AT | 07.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2006 | ||
LU | 07.10.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
HU | 29.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/37] | EE | 28.06.2006 | |
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
RO | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
BG | 28.09.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
GR | 29.09.2006 | ||
AT | 07.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2006 | ||
LU | 07.10.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
HU | 29.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/32] | EE | 28.06.2006 | |
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
RO | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
BG | 28.09.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
GR | 29.09.2006 | ||
AT | 07.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
HU | 29.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/31] | EE | 28.06.2006 | |
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
RO | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
BG | 28.09.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
GR | 29.09.2006 | ||
AT | 07.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | EE | 28.06.2006 | |
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
RO | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
GR | 29.09.2006 | ||
AT | 07.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | NL | 28.06.2006 | |
RO | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
GR | 29.09.2006 | ||
AT | 07.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/14] | NL | 28.06.2006 | |
RO | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
AT | 07.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/02] | NL | 28.06.2006 | |
RO | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | NL | 28.06.2006 | |
RO | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | IT | 28.06.2006 | |
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
RO | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | NL | 28.06.2006 | |
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/20] | NL | 28.06.2006 | |
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | SI | 28.06.2006 | |
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | SI | 28.06.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9745699 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [A] 1-16 * page 14, line 10 - page 19, line 18 * * page 24, line 1 - page 31, line 18 * * page 34, line 3 - line 20; figures 1,2,7A,7B,7C,12 *; | [A]WO9919734 (IRVINE SENSORS CORP [US]) [A] 1-16 * page 4, line 2 - page 5, line 26 ** page 7, line 25 - page 8, line 4; figure 1 * |