EP1556260 - SAFETY ARRANGEMENT FOR SEPARATING INTO TWO ELEMENTS THE DRIVING HEAD OF A WIPER ARM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.2009 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Systèmes d'Essuyage Service Propriété Industrielle 8 Rue Louis Lormand CS 90581 La Verrière 78322 Le Mesnil Saint Denis / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/09] | For all designated states VALEO SYSTEMES D'ESSUYAGE Z.A. de l'Agiot, Boite postale 81, 8 rue Louis Lormand 78321 La Verrière / FR | ||
Former [2005/30] | For all designated states VALEO SYSTEMES D'ESSUYAGE Z.A. de l'Agiot, Boite postale 81, 8 rue Louis Lormand 78321 La Verrière / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EUSTACHE, Jean-Pierre 3, avenue de la Providence F-92160 Antony / FR | [2005/30] | Application number, filing date | 03809304.3 | 22.10.2003 | [2005/30] | WO2003EP11696 | Priority number, date | FR20020013485 | 28.10.2002 Original published format: FR 0213485 | [2005/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004037621 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1556260 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1556260 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/04, B60S1/34 | [2005/30] | CPC: |
B60S1/3436 (EP);
B60S1/0488 (EP);
B60S1/34 (EP);
B60S1/3459 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSANORDNUNG ZUM TRENNEN DES ANTRIEBSKOPFS EINESWISCHERARMS IN ZWEI ELEMENTE | [2005/30] | English: | SAFETY ARRANGEMENT FOR SEPARATING INTO TWO ELEMENTS THE DRIVING HEAD OF A WIPER ARM | [2005/30] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE SECURITE PERMETTANT UNE SEPARATION EN DEUX ELEMENTS DE LA TETE D'ENTRAINEMENT D'UN BRAS D'ESSUIE-GLACE | [2005/30] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/30] | 14.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.02.2008 | CY | 27.02.2008 | DK | 27.02.2008 | EE | 27.02.2008 | FI | 27.02.2008 | IE | 27.02.2008 | IT | 27.02.2008 | NL | 27.02.2008 | RO | 27.02.2008 | SI | 27.02.2008 | BG | 27.05.2008 | SE | 27.05.2008 | GR | 28.05.2008 | ES | 07.06.2008 | PT | 21.07.2008 | GB | 22.10.2008 | LU | 22.10.2008 | BE | 31.10.2008 | CH | 31.10.2008 | LI | 31.10.2008 | MC | 31.10.2008 | [2010/49] |
Former [2010/32] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
CY | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
IT | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
GB | 22.10.2008 | ||
LU | 22.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
CY | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
IT | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
GB | 22.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
CY | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
IT | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
CY | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
IT | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
CY | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
IT | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
CY | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | FI | 27.02.2008 | |
ES | 07.06.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2000062575 ; | [A]DE19833488 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,7* the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000914), vol. 2000, no. 05, & JP2000062575 A 20000229 (ASMO CO LTD;HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1,2,7 * abstract * | by applicant | FR2733474 | WO9938736 |