EP1529365 - EFFICIENT ENCRYPTION AND AUTHENTICATION FOR DATA PROCESSING SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | ||
Former [2005/19] | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAWKES, Philip Michael Unit 30,18-20 Knocklayde Street Ashfield, New South Wales 2131 / AU | 02 /
ROSE, Gregory G. 40 Archer Street Concord, New South Wales 2137 / AU | [2007/25] |
Former [2005/19] | 01 /
HAWKES, Philip Michael Unit 2, 6-8 Belmore Street Burwood, New South Wales 2134 / AU | ||
02 /
ROSE, Gregory G. 40 Archer Street Concord, New South Wales 2137 / AU | Representative(s) | Walsh, Michael Joseph, et al Tomkins & Co. 5, Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/19] | Walsh, Michael Joseph, et al TOMKINS & CO. 5, Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 03809499.1 | 24.07.2003 | [2005/19] | WO2003US23562 | Priority number, date | US20020205132 | 24.07.2002 Original published format: US 205132 | [2005/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004038975 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1529365 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1529365 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.12.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04K1/04, H04K1/06, H04L9/32 | [2006/19] | CPC: |
H04L9/0637 (EP,US);
H04L9/06 (KR);
H04K1/06 (KR);
H04L9/0643 (EP,US);
H04L9/3242 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/19] | H04K1/04, H04K1/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EFFIZIENTE VERSCHLÜSSELUNG UND AUTHENTIFIZIERUNG FÜR DATENVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEME | [2005/19] | English: | EFFICIENT ENCRYPTION AND AUTHENTICATION FOR DATA PROCESSING SYSTEMS | [2005/19] | French: | CHIFFREMENT ET AUTHENTIFICATION EFFICACES POUR SYSTEMES DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNEES | [2005/19] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2005 | Search fee paid | 17.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/19] | 18.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.08.2008 | BE | 13.08.2008 | CY | 13.08.2008 | CZ | 13.08.2008 | DK | 13.08.2008 | EE | 13.08.2008 | FI | 13.08.2008 | IT | 13.08.2008 | NL | 13.08.2008 | RO | 13.08.2008 | SI | 13.08.2008 | SK | 13.08.2008 | TR | 13.08.2008 | BG | 13.11.2008 | SE | 13.11.2008 | GR | 14.11.2008 | ES | 24.11.2008 | PT | 13.01.2009 | HU | 14.02.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
GR | 14.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
HU | 14.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
GR | 14.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 13.08.2008 | |
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | NL | 13.08.2008 | |
ES | 24.11.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US2002071552 (ROGAWAY PHILLIP W [US]); | [A] - GLIGOR V.D. AND DONESCU P., "On Message integrity in Symmetric Encryption", (20001110), XP002982089 | [A] - ROGAWAY P. ET AL, "OCB: A Block-Cipher Mode of Operation for Efficient Authenticated Encryption", (20010803), XP002982090 | [A] - JUTLA C.S., "Encryption modes with almost free message integrity", (20010510), XP002214999 |