EP1556879 - METHOD OF CLEANING ION SOURCE, AND CORRESPONDING APPARATUS/SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.09.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUARDIAN INDUSTRIES CORP. 2300 Harmon Road Auburn Hills, MI 48326-1714 / US | For all designated states ADVANCED ENERGY INDUSTRIES, INC. 1625 Sharp Point Drive Fort Collins, CO 80525 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/30] | For all designated states GUARDIAN INDUSTRIES CORP. 2300 Harmon Road Auburn Hills, Michigan 48326-1714 / US | ||
For all designated states ADVANCED ENERGY INDUSTRIES, INC. 1625 Sharp Point Drive Fort Collins, CO 80525 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADVANCED ENERGY INDUSTRIES, INC. 1625 Sharp Point Dr. Fort Collins, CO 80525 / US | 02 /
LUTEN, Henry, A. 7851 Amrhein Drive Ypsilanti, MI 48197 / US | 03 /
VEERASAMY, Vijayen, S. 5980 Cedar Ridge Drive Ann Arborn, MI 48108 / US | 04 /
FRATI, Maximo 3331 Sun Disk Ct. Fort Collins, CO 80526 / US | 05 /
SHAW, Denise, R. 3309 Hearthfire Drive Fort Collins, CO 80524 / US | [2006/52] |
Former [2005/30] | 01 /
ADVANCED ENERGY INDUSTRIES, INC. 1625 Sharp Point Dr. Fort Collins, CO 80525 / US | ||
02 /
LUTEN, Henry, A. 4587 Hunt Club Dr., Apt. 2B Ypsilanti, MI 48197 / US | |||
03 /
VEERASAMY, Vijayen, S. 5980 Cedar Ridge Drive Ann Arborn, MI 48108 / US | |||
04 /
FRATI, Maximo 3331 Sun Disk Ct. Fort Collins, CO 80526 / US | |||
05 /
SHAW, Denise, R. 3309 Hearthfire Drive Fort Collins, CO 80524 / US | Representative(s) | Hess, Peter K. G. Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/30] | Hess, Peter K., Dipl.-Phys. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenberg . Geissler Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03809578.2 | 20.10.2003 | [2005/30] | WO2003US33095 | Priority number, date | US20020419519P | 21.10.2002 Original published format: US 419519 P | US20030419990 | 22.04.2003 Original published format: US 419990 | [2005/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004038754 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1556879 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01J27/02, H01J37/08, H01J37/32 | [2005/30] | CPC: |
H01J27/143 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2006/06] |
Former [2005/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IONENQUELLENREINIGUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2005/30] | English: | METHOD OF CLEANING ION SOURCE, AND CORRESPONDING APPARATUS/SYSTEM | [2005/30] | French: | PROCEDE DE NETTOYAGE DE SOURCE D'IONS, ET APPAREIL/SYSTEME ASSOCIES | [2005/30] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/30] | 14.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/41] | 29.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.03.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DY]US6037717 (MAISHEV YURI [RU], et al) [DY] 1,9,14,17 * abstract *; | [Y]US4344019 (GAVIN BASIL F, et al) [Y] 1,9,14,17 * claim 1 * |