EP1563098 - GENE EXPRESSION IN BIOLOGICAL CONDITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.04.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 11.05.2011 [2011/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AROS APPLIED BIOTECHNOLOGY APS Gustav Wieds Vej 10 8000 Rhus C / DK | [2005/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ÖRNTOFT, Torben Helgesvej 19 DK-8230 Aabyhöj / DK | 02 /
THYKJAER, Thomas Tranebaervej 26 DK-8220 Brabrand / DK | 03 /
JENSEN, Jens, Ledet Flintebakken 146B DK-8240 Risskov / DK | 04 /
ANDERSEN, Lars, Dyrskjöt Lille Elstedvej 157D DK-8520 Lystrup / DK | [2005/33] | Representative(s) | Høiberg P/S Adelgade 12 1304 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2005/33] | HOEIBERG A/S European Patent & Trademark Attorneys Store Kongensgade 59A 1264 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 03809709.3 | 03.11.2003 | [2005/33] | WO2003DK00750 | Priority number, date | DK20020001685 | 01.11.2002 Original published format: DK 200201685 | [2005/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004040014 | Date: | 13.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1563098 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2005/33] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/118 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/33] | Extension states | AL | 01.06.2005 | LT | 01.06.2005 | LV | 01.06.2005 | MK | 01.06.2005 | Title | German: | GENEXPRESSION BEI BIOLOGISCHEN ZUSTÄNDEN | [2005/33] | English: | GENE EXPRESSION IN BIOLOGICAL CONDITIONS | [2005/33] | French: | EXPRESSION GENIQUE DANS DES ETATS BIOLOGIQUES | [2005/33] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/33] | 14.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 19.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/19] | 08.12.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/19] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 29.12.2008 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6335170 (ORNTOFT TORBEN F [DK]) [X] 1-14,19-33,35-56,62-76 * column 1, line 8 - line 10 * * column 3, line 17 - line 36 * * column 7, line 65 - column 8, line 5; claim - * * table 8, gene name AB000220-at * * abstract *; | [X]WO0202804 (AROS APPLIED BIOTECHNOLOGY APS [DK], et al) [X] 1-14,19-33,35-56,62-76 * page 2, line 30 - page 7, line 18 * * page 9, line 25 - line 35 * * page 71 - page 74 * * page 76, line 7 - page 92 * * page 152, line 5 - line 8 * * page 95, line 4 - line 10; claim - * * abstract *; | [A] - JULIO E. CELIS ET AL, "Gene expression profiling: monitoring transcription and translation products using DNA microarrays and proteomics", FEBS LETTERS, (2000), vol. 480, pages 2 - 16, XP002271897 [A] 1-14,19-33,35-56,62-76 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-5793(00)01771-3 | [A] - MIREIA MARTÍN-SATUÉ ET AL, "Identification of Semaphorin E Gene Expression in Metastatic Human Lung Adenocarcinoma Cells by mRNA Differential Display", JOURNAL OF SURGICAL ONCOLOGY, (1999), vol. 72, pages 18 - 23, XP002271898 [A] 1-14,19-33,35-56,62-76 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1096-9098(199909)72:1<18::AID-JSO5>3.0.CO;2-P | [PX] - LARS DYRSKJÖT ET AL, "Identifying distinct classes of bladder carcinoma using microarrays", NATURE GENETICS, (200301), vol. 33, pages 90 - 96, XP002271899 [PX] 1-14,19-33,35-56,62-76 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ng1061 | Examination | - MANGASSER-STEPHAN K ET AL, "Identification of human semaphorin E gene expression in rheumatoid synovial cells by mRNA differential display.", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS 8 MAY 1997 LNKD- PUBMED:9168980, (19970508), vol. 234, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1006/bbrc.1997.6607, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 153 - 156, XP002286525 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1997.6607 |