EP1561061 - FLEXIBLE TUBULAR PIPE FOR FLUID TRANSPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technip France ZAC Danton, 6-8, allée de l'Arche, Faubourg de l'Arche 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2006/12] |
Former [2005/32] | For all designated states Technip France ZAC Danton, 6-8, allée de l'Arche, Faubourg de l'Arche 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARION, Alain 39, route d'Houppeville 76130 Mont-Saint-Aignan / FR | 02 /
MALOBERTI, René Antoine 196, boulevard de Stalingrad 94500 Champigny-sur-Marne / FR | 03 /
COUTAREL, Alain 10, rue Lefort, Gonssolin 76130 Mont-Saint-Aignan / FR | [2005/32] | Representative(s) | Bertrand, Didier, et al Fédit-Loriot 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Bertrand, Didier, et al S.A. Fedit-Loriot 38 Avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2005/32] | Bertrand, Didier, et al Cabinet FEDIT-LORIOT 38, Avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 03809767.1 | 17.10.2003 | [2005/32] | WO2003FR03076 | Priority number, date | FR20020013377 | 25.10.2002 Original published format: FR 0213377 | [2005/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004040183 | Date: | 13.05.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1561061 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1561061 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16L11/08 | [2005/32] | CPC: |
F16L11/083 (EP);
F16L11/088 (EP);
F16L11/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DK, FR, GB, IE, NL [2005/45] |
Former [2005/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLEXIBLE RÖHRENFÖRMIGE LEITUNG ZUM FLUIDTRANSPORT | [2005/32] | English: | FLEXIBLE TUBULAR PIPE FOR FLUID TRANSPORT | [2005/32] | French: | CONDUITE TUBULAIRE FLEXIBLE POUR LE TRANSPORT D UN FLUIDE | [2005/32] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/32] | 12.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4567916 (ANTAL SANDOR [HU], et al) [A] 8 * column 3, lines 18-25 * * column 5, lines 16-39 * * figure 3 *; | [XY]FR2663401 (COFLEXIP [FR]) [X] 1-3,6,7 * page 6, lines 18-28 * * page 9, line 36 - page 10, line 8 * * page 14, lines 3-27 * * figures 3,4 * [Y] 4,5; | [DYA]EP0937932 (COFLEXIP [FR]) [DY] 4,5 * column 2, lines 32-44 * * column 8, line 35 - column 9, line 19 * * figure 3 * [A] 1-3,6-9; | [A]US6039083 (LOPER COBIE W [US]) [A] 1-9 * column 2, lines 26-63 * * column 6, lines 3-8 ** figure - * |