EP1567429 - COLLAPSIBLE FLAT RACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clive-Smith, Martin Wootton Paddox Leek Wootton Warwickshire CV35 7QX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/29] | For all designated states Clive-Smith, Martin Wootton Paddox, Leek Wootton Warwickshire CV35 7QX / GB | ||
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states Clive-Smith, Martin Wootton Paddox, Leek Wootton Warwickshire CV35 7QX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/35] | Representative(s) | Tillbrook, Christopher John The Intellectual Property Shop Ltd. The Old Village Hall School Street Churchover Rugby Warwickshire CV23 0EG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/35] | Tillbrook, Christopher John Tillbrook & Co 1 Mill Street Warwick CV34 4HB / GB | Application number, filing date | 03810535.9 | 05.11.2003 | [2005/35] | WO2003GB04805 | Priority number, date | GB20020026012 | 07.11.2002 Original published format: GB 0226012 | [2005/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004041679 | Date: | 21.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1567429 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1567429 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65D88/12 | [2005/35] | CPC: |
B65D88/005 (EP,US);
B65D88/022 (EP,US);
B65D88/129 (EP,US);
B65D88/522 (EP,US);
B65D90/0026 (EP,US);
B65D2585/6867 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENKLAPPBARES FLACHES GESTELL | [2005/35] | English: | COLLAPSIBLE FLAT RACK | [2005/35] | French: | PLATE-FORME DROITE PORTE-AUTOMOBILES REPLIABLE | [2005/35] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/35] | 23.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/26] | Request for further processing for: | 04.06.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 04.06.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.06.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.07.2007 | BE | 18.07.2007 | CH | 18.07.2007 | CY | 18.07.2007 | CZ | 18.07.2007 | DK | 18.07.2007 | EE | 18.07.2007 | FI | 18.07.2007 | LI | 18.07.2007 | RO | 18.07.2007 | SI | 18.07.2007 | SK | 18.07.2007 | TR | 18.07.2007 | BG | 18.10.2007 | SE | 18.10.2007 | GR | 19.10.2007 | ES | 29.10.2007 | IE | 05.11.2007 | LU | 05.11.2007 | MC | 30.11.2007 | PT | 18.12.2007 | HU | 19.01.2008 | FR | 14.03.2008 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/40] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
CY | 18.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
EE | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
RO | 18.07.2007 | ||
SI | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
IE | 05.11.2007 | ||
LU | 05.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
FR | 14.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
CY | 18.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
EE | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
RO | 18.07.2007 | ||
SI | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
IE | 05.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
FR | 14.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
EE | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
RO | 18.07.2007 | ||
SI | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
IE | 05.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
FR | 14.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
EE | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
RO | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
IE | 05.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
FR | 14.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
RO | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
IE | 05.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
FR | 14.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
RO | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
FR | 14.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
RO | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
RO | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | FI | 18.07.2007 | |
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | BG | 18.10.2007 | |
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | ES | 29.10.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3801177 (YOUMANS D, et al) [A] 1-26 * column 2, line 44 - column 6, line 48; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US4116135 (JAEKLE WILLIAM M, et al) [A] 1-26 * column 1, line 65 - column 3, line 42; figures 1,3 *; | [A]US4913061 (YOUNGBLOOD BERNARD J [US]) [A] 1-26* column 2, line 39 - column 3, line 34; figures 1-7 *; | [A]US5253975 (TAKAGUCHI HIROYUKI [JP]) [A] 1-26 * See abstract;; figures 1,2,7,8 *; | [A]EP0893366 (GLOYSTEIN JUERGEN DIPL ING [DE]) [A] 1-26 * column 5, line 15 - column 11, line 30; figures 2,4,5 *; | [A]WO0069677 (CLIVE SMITH MARTIN [GB]) [A] 1-26 * figures 1A-5A,1B-5B; claims 1-20 * |