EP1568693 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING QUINOLINECARBALDEHYDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nissan Chemical Industries, Ltd. 7-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0054 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states Nissan Chemical Industries, Ltd. 7-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0054 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGASHIMA, Kensuke, c/o KURARAY CO., LTD. 2-28, Kuashiki-cho, Nakajo-machi Kitakanbara-gun, Niigata 959-2691 / JP | 02 /
FUKUMOTO, Takashi, c/o KURARAY CO., LTD. 2-28, Kurashiki-cho, Nakajo-machi Kitakanbara-gun, Niigata 959-2691 / JP | 03 /
HAYASHIBARA, Tatsuhiko, c/o KURARAY CO., LTD. 2-28, Kurashiki-cho, Nakajo-machi Kitakanbara-gun, Niigata 959-2691 / JP | 04 /
TORIHARA, Masahiro, c/o KURARAY CO., LTD. 2-28, Kurashiki-cho, Nakajo-machi Kitakanbara-gun, Niigata 959-2691 / JP | [2005/35] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2009/29] | von Kreisler, Alek, et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2005/35] | von Kreisler, Alek, et al Deichmannhaus am Dom, Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 03810618.3 | 06.11.2003 | [2005/35] | WO2003JP14134 | Priority number, date | JP20020322170 | 06.11.2002 Original published format: JP 2002322170 | JP20020322172 | 06.11.2002 Original published format: JP 2002322172 | [2005/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004041787 | Date: | 21.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1568693 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.05.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07D215/14, C07D319/06 | [2005/35] | CPC: |
C07D405/04 (EP,US);
C07D215/14 (EP,KR,US);
C07D263/06 (EP,US);
C07D317/26 (EP,US);
C07D319/06 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON CHINOLINCARBALDEHYD | [2005/35] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING QUINOLINECARBALDEHYDE | [2005/35] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE QUINOLINECARBALDEHYDE | [2005/35] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2005 | Translation filed | 02.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2005 | Search fee paid | 02.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/35] | 03.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/02] | 03.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2008 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2004089928 (KURARAY CO [JP], et al) [E] 11* the whole document *; | [E] - FUKUMOTO, TAKASHI ET AL, "Process for producing 3-cyclopropyl-3-oxopropanal acetal compound", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2004:878387, URL: STN, XP002444421 [E] 11 * RNs 777091-52-8, 691363-79-8, 691363-80-1, 691363-81-2, 777091-60-8 * | International search | [A]EP0535548 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP], et al); | [A]EP0304063 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]); | [A]JPH0827114 (SUMIKA FINE CHEMICALS CO LTD, et al); | [A]WO0160800 (KURARAY CO [JP], et al); | [A]WO9406746 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP], et al); | [X]JPH05222086 (MICROBIAL CHEM RES FOUND); | [X] - HOSOKAWA T, "Palladium(II)-catalyzed acetalization of terminal olefins bearing electron-withdrawing substituents with optically active diols", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1987), vol. 52, no. 9, pages 1758 - 64, XP002202696 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00385a021 | [X] - HOSOKAWA T, "Catalysis of Pd(II)-catalyzed acetalization of alkenes with diols", BULLETIN OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, (1990), vol. 63, no. 1, pages 166 - 9, XP002185065 | [X] - BERTRAND T, "Reactive des derives de cyclopropylidene-3 propyle-i synthese d'alcools beta-cyclopropylideniques", TETRAHEDRON, (1981), vol. 37, no. 9, pages 1703 - 1710, XP002976562 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(01)98934-3 | [X] - KOZIKOWSKI A.P, "A nitrile oxide based entry to 2,3-dihydropyran-4-ones. Synthesis of a protected version "Compactin lactone" in racemic and optically active forms", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1985), vol. 50, no. 6, pages 778 - 85, XP002976563 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00206a010 | [X] - ISMAILOV A.G., "Synthesis and reaction of cyclopentyl beta-chlorovinyl ketone", AZERBAIDZHANSKII KHIMICHESKII ZHURNAL, (1975), no. 1, pages 38 - 43, XP002976564 | [X] - GUSEINOV M.M., "Synthesis of cyclohexyl beta,beta-dialkoxyethyl and beta-alkoxyvinyl ketones", AZERBAIDZHANSKII KHIMICHESKII ZHURNAL, (1967), no. 2, pages 55 - 59, XP002976565 |