EP1556257 - VARIABLE TIME VENTING ALGORITHM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KEY SAFETY SYSTEMS, INC. 7000 Nineteen Mile Road Sterling Heights, MI 48314 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/30] | For all designated states KEY SAFETY SYSTEMS, INC. 7000 Nineteen Mile Road Sterling Heights, Michigan 48314 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIOUTSOS, Tony 29500 Ashford Parkway Farmington Hills, MI 48334 / US | 02 /
TABAR, Daniel 442 Sylvan Drive Canton, MI 48188 / US | [2007/04] |
Former [2005/30] | 01 /
GIOUTSOS, Tony 25500 Constitution Avenue Novi, MI 48375 / US | ||
02 /
TABAR, Daniel 442 Sylvan Drive Canton, MI 48188 / US | Representative(s) | Gislon, Gabriele Marietti, Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l. Via Larga, 16 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/30] | Gislon, Gabriele Marietti, Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l. Via Larga, 16 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 03810740.5 | 13.06.2003 | [2005/30] | WO2003US18454 | Priority number, date | US20020422699P | 31.10.2002 Original published format: US 422699 P | US20030388428 | 17.03.2003 Original published format: US 388428 | [2005/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004041600 | Date: | 21.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1556257 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.05.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/26, G06T7/00, // B60R21/015 | [2009/52] | CPC: |
B60R21/01504 (EP,US);
B60R21/16 (KR);
B60R21/26 (KR);
B60R2021/01218 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/30] | B60R21/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/30] | Title | German: | ENTLÜFTUNGSALGORITHMUS MIT VARIABLER ZEIT | [2005/30] | English: | VARIABLE TIME VENTING ALGORITHM | [2005/30] | French: | ALGORITHME POUR PRISE D'AIR A TEMPORISATION VARIABLE | [2005/30] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2005 | Search fee paid | 21.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/30] | 19.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/34] | 29.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.08.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0990567 (HIRTENBERGER PRAEZISIONSTECHNI [AT]) [X] 1-20 * abstract ** paragraphs [0017] - [0018]; figure . * | International search | [A]DE19611384 (HS TECH & DESIGN [DE]); | [X]US5957490 (SINNHUBER RUPRECHT [DE]); | [A]US6129379 (SPECHT MARTIN [DE]); | [X]US6308983 (SINNHUBER RUPRECHT [DE]) | by applicant | US6129379 |