EP1567245 - INSTALLATION FOR DRYING OR DEHYDRATING GOODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FREH, Alfred Rax-Bergen 98 A-8380 Jennersdorf / AT | For all designated states Reiterbauer, Alois Schildbach 30 A-8230 Hartberg / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states FREH, Alfred Rax-Bergen 98 A-8380 Jennersdorf / AT | ||
For all designated states REITERBAUER, Alois Schildbach 30 A-8230 Hartberg / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wiedl, Alfred Hochfeldstrasse 20 9523 Landskron / AT | 02 /
Freh, Alfred Rax-Bergen 98 8380 Jennersdorf / AT | 03 /
Reiterbauer, Alois Schildbach 20 8230 Hartberg / AT | [2005/35] | Representative(s) | Wildhack, Helmut Wildhack & Jellinek Patentanwälte OG Landstrasser Hauptstrasse 50 1030 Wien / AT | [2009/31] |
Former [2005/35] | Wildhack, Helmut Patentanwälte Wildhack - Jellinek Landstrasser Hauptstrasse 50 1030 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 03810899.9 | 12.11.2003 | [2005/35] | WO2003AT00341 | Priority number, date | AT20020001702 | 12.11.2002 Original published format: AT 17022002 | [2005/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004043574 | Date: | 27.05.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1567245 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1567245 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/26, F26B21/02, F26B21/00 | [2005/35] | CPC: |
B01D53/261 (EP,US);
F26B21/083 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40094 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANLAGE ZUM TROCKNEN BZW. ENTFEUCHTEN VON GÜTERN | [2005/35] | English: | INSTALLATION FOR DRYING OR DEHYDRATING GOODS | [2005/35] | French: | INSTALLATION POUR SECHER OU DESHYDRATER DES PRODUITS | [2005/35] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/35] | 01.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 26.03.2008 | CZ | 26.03.2008 | DK | 26.03.2008 | EE | 26.03.2008 | FI | 26.03.2008 | IE | 26.03.2008 | IT | 26.03.2008 | NL | 26.03.2008 | RO | 26.03.2008 | SI | 26.03.2008 | SK | 26.03.2008 | TR | 26.03.2008 | BG | 26.06.2008 | SE | 26.06.2008 | GR | 27.06.2008 | ES | 07.07.2008 | PT | 01.09.2008 | HU | 27.09.2008 | GB | 12.11.2008 | LU | 12.11.2008 | BE | 30.11.2008 | CH | 30.11.2008 | LI | 30.11.2008 | MC | 30.11.2008 | [2010/49] |
Former [2010/37] | CY | 26.03.2008 | |
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
IE | 26.03.2008 | ||
IT | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
TR | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
HU | 27.09.2008 | ||
GB | 12.11.2008 | ||
LU | 12.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 26.03.2008 | |
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
IE | 26.03.2008 | ||
IT | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
HU | 27.09.2008 | ||
GB | 12.11.2008 | ||
LU | 12.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | CY | 26.03.2008 | |
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
IE | 26.03.2008 | ||
IT | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
GB | 12.11.2008 | ||
LU | 12.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | CY | 26.03.2008 | |
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
IE | 26.03.2008 | ||
IT | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
GB | 12.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/50] | CY | 26.03.2008 | |
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
IE | 26.03.2008 | ||
IT | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/43] | CY | 26.03.2008 | |
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
IE | 26.03.2008 | ||
IT | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/40] | CZ | 26.03.2008 | |
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
IE | 26.03.2008 | ||
IT | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | CZ | 26.03.2008 | |
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
IE | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | CZ | 26.03.2008 | |
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
IE | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 26.03.2008 | |
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
IE | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | CZ | 26.03.2008 | |
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
IE | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/01] | CZ | 26.03.2008 | |
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | CZ | 26.03.2008 | |
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | FI | 26.03.2008 | |
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | FI | 26.03.2008 | |
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 26.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4601114 (NOGUCHI HARUO [JP]) [A] 1-11 * claim 1 *; | [A]DE29820870U (POTTHOFF RUEDIGER [DE]) [A] 1-11* figure 1 *; | [A]DE20106617U (WITTMANN ROBOT SYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11 * figure 1 * | by applicant | CH436612 | US4038054 | US4421651 | EP0379975 | US5429665 | EP1010452 |