EP1546350 - CELLS OVEREXPRESSING LIPOYL-PROTEIN LIGASE B-GENE FOR FERMENTATIVE PRODUCTION OF R-ALPHA-LIPONIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.2006 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Consortium für elektrochemische Industrie GmbH Zielstattstrasse 20 81379 München / DE | [2005/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DASSLER, Tobias Himalajastrasse 14 81825 München / DE | [2005/26] | Representative(s) | Potten, Holger, et al Wacker Chemie AG Zentralbereich Patente, Marken und Lizenzen Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Potten, Holger, et al Wacker Chemie AG Zentralbereich Patente, Marken und Lizenzen Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/26] | Potten, Holger, et al Wacker-Chemie GmbH Zentralbereich PML, Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03810946.8 | 25.09.2003 | [2005/26] | WO2003EP10687 | Priority number, date | DE2002145993 | 02.10.2002 Original published format: DE 10245993 | [2005/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004044211 | Date: | 27.05.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1546350 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C12P7/42, C12N15/63, C12N1/21, C07D339/04 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
C12N9/93 (EP,US);
C12N15/63 (EP,US);
C12P11/00 (EP,US);
C12P17/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/04] |
Former [2005/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ZELLEN DIE, EIN LIPOYL-PROTEIN-LIGASE B-GEN ÖBEREXPRIMIEREN, ZUR FERMENTATIVEN HERSTELLUNG VON R-ALPHA-LIPONSÄURE | [2005/27] | English: | CELLS OVEREXPRESSING LIPOYL-PROTEIN LIGASE B-GENE FOR FERMENTATIVE PRODUCTION OF R-ALPHA-LIPONIC ACID | [2005/26] | French: | CELLULES SUREXPRIMANT UN GENE DE LIGASE B DE PROTEINE LIPOYLE PERMETTANT DE PRODUIRE PAR FERMENTATION DE L'ACIDE LIPOIQUE R-ALPHA | [2005/26] |
Former [2005/26] | ZELLEN DIE, EIN LIPOYL-PROTEIN-LIGASE B-GEN BEREXPRIMIEREN, ZUR FERMENTATIVEN HERSTELLUNG VON R-ALPHA-LIPONS URE | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 10.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.04.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/42] | 11.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE10042739 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [X] 8 * example 2; claims 1-5 *; | [XD] - REED K E ET AL, "LIPOIC ACID METABOLISM IN ESCHERICHIA COLI: SEQUENCING AND FUNCTIONAL CHARACTERIZATION OF LIPA AND LIPB GENES", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (199303), vol. 175, no. 5, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 1325 - 1336, XP008025890 [XD] 1-10 * the whole document * | [XY] - VAISVILA ROMAS ET AL, "The LipB protein is a negative regulator of dam gene expression in Escherichia coli", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (20001115), vol. 1494, no. 1-2, ISSN 0006-3002, pages 43 - 53, XP004275790 [X] 1-10 * the whole document * [Y] 11-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-4781(00)00209-8 | [X] - JORDAN SEAN W ET AL, "A new metabolic link: The acyl carrier protein of lipid synthesis donates lipoic acid to the pyruvate dehydrogenase complex in Escherichia coli and mitochondria", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 272, no. 29, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 17903 - 17906, XP002268661 [X] 1-10 * page 17905, column L, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.272.29.17903 | [X] - MORRIS TIMOTHY W ET AL, "Lipoic Acid Metabolism in Escherichia coli: The lplA and lipB Genes Define Redundant Pathways for Ligation of Lipoyl Groups to Apoprotein", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (1995), vol. 177, no. 1, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 1 - 10, XP002268660 [X] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/path.1711770102 | [X] - YASUNO R ET AL, "Biosynthesis of lipoic acid in arabidopsis: cloning and characterization of the cDNA for lipoic acid synthase", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF PLANT PHYSIOLOGISTS, ROCKVILLE, MD, US, (1998), vol. 118, ISSN 0032-0889, pages 935 - 943, XP002961224 [X] 8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1104/pp.118.3.935 | [X] - CHEN X J, "Cloning and characterization of the lipoyl-protein ligase gene LIPB from the yeast Kluyveromyces lactis: Synergistic respiratory deficiency due to mutations in LIPB and mitochondrial F-1-ATPase subunits", MOLECULAR AND GENERAL GENETICS, (1997), vol. 255, no. 3, ISSN 0026-8925, pages 341 - 349, XP002268663 [X] 8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s004380050505 | [Y] - MCFARLAN SARA ET AL, "Production of alpha-lipoic acid by a recombinant organism", ABSTRACTS OF PAPERS AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, 224th National Meeting of the American Chemical Society;Boston, MA, USA; August 18-22, 2002, (20020818), vol. 224, no. 1-2, ISSN 0065-7727, page BIOT 220, XP008027301 [Y] 11-13 * the whole document * | [PX] - JORDAN SEAN W ET AL, "The Escherichia coli lipB gene encodes lipoyl (octanoyl)-acyl carrier protein:protein transferase.", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (200303), vol. 185, no. 5, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 1582 - 1589, XP002268662 [PX] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JB.185.5.1582-1589.2003 | [AD] - GOPALAN A S ET AL, "STEREOCHEMICAL CONTROL OF YEAST REDUCTIONS: SYNTHESIS OF R-(+)-ALPHA-LIPOIC ACID", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1989), vol. 30, no. 42, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 5705 - 5708, XP001018157 [AD] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)76176-4 |