EP1563895 - COMPOSITE POROUS MEMBRANE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE MEMBRANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI RAYON CO., LTD. 6-41, Konan 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8506 / JP | [2010/31] |
Former [2005/33] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd. 6-41, Konan 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8506 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHINADA, Katsuhiko, Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd. Corporate Research Laboratories, 20-1, Miyuki-cho Otake-shi, Hiroshima 739-0698 / JP | 02 /
MURASE, Kei, Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd. Corporate Research Laboratories, 20-1, Miyuki-cho Otake-shi, Hiroshima 739-0698 / JP | 03 /
YAMADA, Teruyuki, Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd. Corporate Research Laboratories, 20-1, Miyuki-cho Otake-shi, Hiroshima 739-0698 / JP | 04 /
SHIRASU, Yuuichi, Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd. Corporate Research Laboratories, 20-1, Miyuki-cho Otake-shi, Hiroshima 739-0698 / JP | 05 /
MIZUTA, Masahiko, Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd. Corporate Research Laboratories, 20-1, Miyuki-cho Otake-shi, Hiroshima 739-0698 / JP | 06 /
FUJIKI, Hiroyuki, Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd. Otake Production Center, 20-1, Miyuki-cho Otake-shi, Hiroshima 739-0698 / JP | [2005/33] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/33] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03811093.8 | 10.11.2003 | [2005/33] | WO2003JP14262 | Priority number, date | JP20020328085 | 12.11.2002 Original published format: JP 2002328085 | JP20030194892 | 10.07.2003 Original published format: JP 2003194892 | [2005/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004043579 | Date: | 27.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1563895 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1563895 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.05.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B01D69/12, B01D69/08, B01D69/10 | [2008/27] | CPC: |
B01D69/08 (EP,KR);
B01D69/1216 (KR);
B01D69/1071 (EP,KR,US);
B01D67/0013 (KR);
B01D67/0016 (KR);
B01D69/1218 (EP,KR,US);
B01D71/34 (EP,KR);
B01D2323/46 (KR);
B01D2325/023 (EP,KR);
B01D2325/02834 (KR);
B01D2325/20 (KR);
B01D2325/24 (EP,KR);
B01D2325/34 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/33] | B01D69/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2006/09] |
Former [2005/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | PORÖSE VERBUNDMEMBRAN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER MEMBRAN | [2005/33] | English: | COMPOSITE POROUS MEMBRANE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE MEMBRANE | [2005/33] | French: | MEMBRANE POREUSE COMPOSITE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2005/33] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2005 | Translation filed | 10.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2005 | Search fee paid | 10.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/33] | 26.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPS5281076 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | [DA]JPS5282682 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | [DA]JPS52120288 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | [A]JPH0549877 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [Y]US5242636 (SLUMA HEINZ-DIETER [DE], et al); | [DXY]US5472607 (MAILVAGANAM MAHENDRAN [CA], et al); | [A]EP1063004 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]); | [XY]WO0078437 (ZENON ENVIRONMENTAL INC [CA]); | [A]WO0236327 (GKSS FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM [DE], et al) | International search | [A]JPS6051363B ; | [X]US5914039 (MAHENDRAN MAILVAGANAM [CA], et al); | [XP]JP2003311133 (DAICEL CHEM) | by applicant | JPS5281076 | JPS5282682 | JPS52120288 | US5472607 | WO0078437 |