31.01.2014 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] |
28.10.2013 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
02.08.2013 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.06.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.03.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.03.2013 |
First examination report |
|
01.06.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.05.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.05.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.06.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.06.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.06.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.06.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.01.2006 |
Change - extension states |
published on 01.03.2006 [2006/09] |
07.07.2005 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
17.06.2005 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.08.2005 [2005/31] |
17.06.2005 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.08.2005 [2005/31] |
16.06.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.06.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.05.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.05.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.05.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.02.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.06.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.05.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.05.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|