EP1559115 - FLEXIBLE HIGH-IMPEDANCE INTERCONNECT CABLE WITH CATHETER FACILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/31] | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, Massachusetts 02048 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUCK, Arthur 28801 SW Ladd Hill Road Sherwood, OR 97140 / US | 02 /
DAANE, Laurence, A. 29645 SW Rose Lane 261 Wilsonville, OR 97070 / US | [2005/31] | Representative(s) | Tomlinson, Edward James Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Possartstrasse 20 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/31] | Tomlinson, Edward James Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Possartstrasse 20 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03811181.1 | 27.05.2003 | [2005/31] | WO2003US16554 | Priority number, date | US20020290590 | 07.11.2002 Original published format: US 290590 | [2005/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004044928 | Date: | 27.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1559115 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01B7/04 | [2005/31] | CPC: |
H01B7/041 (EP,US);
H01B7/04 (KR);
H01B11/1895 (KR);
H01B11/20 (KR);
H01B7/048 (KR);
H01B7/0892 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIEGSAMES HOCHIMPEDANZ-VERBINDUNGSKABEL MIT KATHETERANSCHLUSSMÖGLICHKEIT | [2005/31] | English: | FLEXIBLE HIGH-IMPEDANCE INTERCONNECT CABLE WITH CATHETER FACILITY | [2005/31] | French: | CABLE D'INTERCONNEXION SOUPLE A IMPEDANCE UTILISE AVEC UN MATERIEL DE CATHETER | [2005/31] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/31] | 27.06.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/10] | 29.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.03.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]US2002139562 (DAANE LARRY [US], et al) [AD] 1-20 * page 1, column 2 - page 4, column 2; figures 1-8 *; | [A]EP0718854 (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [A] 1-20 * column 2, line 14 - column 6, line 38; figures 1-3 * |