EP1571363 - A SHAFT COUPLING UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xie, Xingyun 1 Floor West 72 Building Tong Zi Po River West, Changsha Hunan 410013 / CN | [2008/09] |
Former [2005/36] | For all designated states Xie, Xingyun 1 Floor West 72 Building Tong Zi Po River West, Changsha Hunan 410013 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/36] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/36] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichtstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03811326.2 | 10.11.2003 | [2005/36] | WO2003CN00945 | Priority number, date | CN20021050200 | 16.11.2002 Original published format: CN 02150200 | [2005/36] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004046576 | Date: | 03.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1571363 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1571363 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.06.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16D67/00, F16D59/02 | [2006/21] | CPC: |
F16D67/00 (EP,US);
F16D59/00 (KR);
F16D59/02 (KR);
F16D2121/14 (EP,US);
F16D2127/005 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/36] | F16D59/00, F16D67/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WELLENKUPPLUNGSEINHEIT | [2005/36] | English: | A SHAFT COUPLING UNIT | [2005/36] | French: | UNITE DE COUPLAGE D'ARBRE | [2005/36] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2005 | Translation filed | 10.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2005 | Search fee paid | 10.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/36] | 14.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.02.2008 | BE | 27.02.2008 | CY | 27.02.2008 | CZ | 27.02.2008 | DK | 27.02.2008 | EE | 27.02.2008 | FI | 27.02.2008 | IT | 27.02.2008 | NL | 27.02.2008 | RO | 27.02.2008 | SI | 27.02.2008 | SK | 27.02.2008 | TR | 27.02.2008 | BG | 27.05.2008 | SE | 27.05.2008 | GR | 28.05.2008 | ES | 07.06.2008 | PT | 21.07.2008 | HU | 28.08.2008 | IE | 10.11.2008 | LU | 10.11.2008 | [2010/49] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
CY | 27.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IT | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
TR | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
HU | 28.08.2008 | ||
IE | 10.11.2008 | ||
LU | 10.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
CY | 27.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IT | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
HU | 28.08.2008 | ||
IE | 10.11.2008 | ||
LU | 10.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
CY | 27.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IT | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
IE | 10.11.2008 | ||
LU | 10.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
CY | 27.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IT | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
IE | 10.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
CY | 27.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IT | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
CY | 27.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | FI | 27.02.2008 | |
ES | 07.06.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4049098 (KITA YASUO, et al) [A] 1-4,7-9,20* the whole document * | International search | [A]US3994376 (FULGHUM DAVID A); | [A]WO9601380 (XIE XINGYUN [CN]); | [XP]CN1397743 (XIONG YUEHUA [CN]) |