EP1563051 - METHOD OF LAUNDERING COLOURED FABRICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CH, HU, IE, LI, LU | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DY / GB | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/16] | For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DY / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [2009/03] | For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DY / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [2006/17] | For:CY
GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House, Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [2005/33] | For:CY
GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House, Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IT
LI
LU
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COOKE, Deborah, Jane, Unilever R & D Port Sunlight Quarry Road East, Bebington Wirral, Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | 02 /
DIXON, Sarah, Unilever R & D Port Sunlight Quarry Road East, Bebington Wirral, Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | 03 /
FINCH, Timothy, David 60 Sunningdale Drive, Bromborough Wirral, Merseyside CH63 0JE / GB | 04 /
LAURIE, Colette, Elizabeth 5 Hemsworth Avenue Little Sutton, Cheshire CH63 3JW / GB | 05 /
PARKER, Andrew, Philip, Unilever R&D Port Sunlight Quarry Road East, Bebington Wirral, Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | [2005/33] | Representative(s) | Elliott, Peter William, et al Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | Elliott, Peter William, et al Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [2006/03] | Elliott, Peter William, et al Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [2005/33] | Elliott, Peter William Unilever N.V. Unilever Intellectual Property Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 03811382.5 | 18.11.2003 | [2005/33] | WO2003EP12926 | Priority number, date | GB20020027242 | 21.11.2002 Original published format: GB 0227242 | [2005/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004046295 | Date: | 03.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1563051 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1563051 | Date: | 21.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C11D11/00, C11D3/22 | [2005/33] | CPC: |
C11D3/225 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASCHVERFAHREN FÜR FARBIGE WÄSCHE | [2005/33] | English: | METHOD OF LAUNDERING COLOURED FABRICS | [2005/33] | French: | PROCEDE DE LAVAGE DE TISSUS COLORES | [2005/33] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/33] | 04.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.01.2011
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 57 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | 02
21.01.2011
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnatti, Ohio 45202 / US Opponent's representative Samuels, Lucy Alice, et al, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.01.2011
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 57 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
21.01.2011
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnatti, Ohio 45202 / US Opponent's representative Samuels, Lucy Alice, et al, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | |||
Former [2011/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.01.2011
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 57 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | 03.03.2011 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.09.2011 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.12.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.12.2012 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2013/22] | 11.01.2013 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 11.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.04.2010 | BE | 21.04.2010 | CY | 21.04.2010 | CZ | 21.04.2010 | DK | 21.04.2010 | EE | 21.04.2010 | FI | 21.04.2010 | NL | 21.04.2010 | RO | 21.04.2010 | SE | 21.04.2010 | SI | 21.04.2010 | SK | 21.04.2010 | BG | 21.07.2010 | GR | 22.07.2010 | PT | 23.08.2010 | HU | 22.10.2010 | IE | 18.11.2010 | LU | 18.11.2010 | CH | 30.11.2010 | LI | 30.11.2010 | MC | 30.11.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 21.04.2010 | |
BE | 21.04.2010 | ||
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2010 | ||
DK | 21.04.2010 | ||
EE | 21.04.2010 | ||
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
NL | 21.04.2010 | ||
RO | 21.04.2010 | ||
SE | 21.04.2010 | ||
SI | 21.04.2010 | ||
SK | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
PT | 23.08.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 21.04.2010 | |
BE | 21.04.2010 | ||
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2010 | ||
DK | 21.04.2010 | ||
EE | 21.04.2010 | ||
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
NL | 21.04.2010 | ||
RO | 21.04.2010 | ||
SE | 21.04.2010 | ||
SI | 21.04.2010 | ||
SK | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
PT | 23.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 21.04.2010 | |
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2010 | ||
DK | 21.04.2010 | ||
EE | 21.04.2010 | ||
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
NL | 21.04.2010 | ||
RO | 21.04.2010 | ||
SE | 21.04.2010 | ||
SI | 21.04.2010 | ||
SK | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
PT | 23.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 21.04.2010 | |
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
DK | 21.04.2010 | ||
EE | 21.04.2010 | ||
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
NL | 21.04.2010 | ||
SE | 21.04.2010 | ||
SI | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
PT | 23.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 21.04.2010 | |
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
DK | 21.04.2010 | ||
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
NL | 21.04.2010 | ||
SE | 21.04.2010 | ||
SI | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 21.04.2010 | |
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
NL | 21.04.2010 | ||
SE | 21.04.2010 | ||
SI | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 21.04.2010 | |
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
NL | 21.04.2010 | ||
SE | 21.04.2010 | ||
SI | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 21.04.2010 | |
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
NL | 21.04.2010 | ||
SE | 21.04.2010 | ||
SI | 21.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 21.04.2010 | |
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
NL | 21.04.2010 | ||
SE | 21.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 21.04.2010 | |
NL | 21.04.2010 | ||
SE | 21.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 21.04.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9829528 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1-10* page 3, line 10 - page 8, line 16; claim - *; | [X]WO9961479 (METSA SPEC CHEM OY [FI], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 4, line 11 - line 17; claim - * * page 5, line 9 - line 35 *; | [X]WO0065015 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 2, line 16 - line 25; example -; claim - * * page 13, line 16 - line 22 * * page 18, line 8 - line 26 * |