EP1568019 - DETERMINING A VALUE OF A RECORDING PULSE PARAMETER FOR OPTICAL RECORDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2009/01] |
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STAN, Sorin, G. P.O. Box 220 NL-5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2005/35] | Representative(s) | Uittenbogaard, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/35] | Uittenbogaard, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 03811449.2 | 07.11.2003 | [2005/35] | WO2003IB05119 | Priority number, date | US20020427217P | 18.11.2002 Original published format: US 427217 P | [2005/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004047090 | Date: | 03.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1568019 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1568019 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/09, G11B7/125, G11B7/00, G11B11/105 | [2005/35] | CPC: |
G11B7/1267 (EP,US);
G11B7/0045 (KR);
G11B11/10595 (EP,US);
G11B7/004 (KR);
G11B7/00736 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESTIMMUNG EINES WERTS EINES AUFZEICHNUNGSIMPULSPARAMETERS FÜR DIE OPTISCHE AUFZEICHNUNG | [2008/35] | English: | DETERMINING A VALUE OF A RECORDING PULSE PARAMETER FOR OPTICAL RECORDING | [2005/35] | French: | DETERMINATION DE LA VALEUR D'UN PARAMETRE D'IMPULSION D'ENREGISTREMENT POUR UN ENREGISTREMENT OPTIQUE | [2005/35] |
Former [2005/35] | BESTIMMUNG EINES WERTS EINES AUFZEICHNUNGSIMPULSPARAMETERS F R DIE OPTISCHE AUFZEICHNUNG | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/35] | 27.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.12.2008 | BE | 31.12.2008 | CY | 31.12.2008 | CZ | 31.12.2008 | DK | 31.12.2008 | EE | 31.12.2008 | FI | 31.12.2008 | IT | 31.12.2008 | NL | 31.12.2008 | RO | 31.12.2008 | SI | 31.12.2008 | SK | 31.12.2008 | TR | 31.12.2008 | BG | 31.03.2009 | SE | 31.03.2009 | GR | 01.04.2009 | ES | 11.04.2009 | PT | 01.06.2009 | HU | 01.07.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
IT | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
GR | 01.04.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
HU | 01.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
IT | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
GR | 01.04.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
GR | 01.04.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | BE | 31.12.2008 | |
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | BE | 31.12.2008 | |
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | BE | 31.12.2008 | |
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/26] | FI | 31.12.2008 | |
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2000137918 ; | [A]EP0865035 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 * figures 14-18; example 2 *; | [A]WO9930316 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-8 * page 5, line 23 - page 11, line 29; figure 1 *; | [A]US2002031060 (MASHIMO AKIRA [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0086] - [0110]; figures 15-20 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001006), vol. 2000, no. 08, & JP2000137918 A 20000516 (SONY CORP) [A] 1-8 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH0115244 | EP0865035 | WO9930316 | JP2000137918 | US2002031060 |