EP1592332 - HINGE MOUNTING APPARATUS FOR THE TOILET BOWLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/45] | HINGE MOUNTING APPARATUS FOR THE PANS | ||
[2007/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.08.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eczacibasi Yapi Gerecleri Sanayi Ve Ticaret Anonim Sirketi Yunus Tren Istasyonu Yani 81412 Kartal Istanbul / TR | [2007/39] |
Former [2005/45] | For all designated states Eczacibasi Yapi Gerecleri Sanayi Ve Ticaret Anonim Sirketi Yunus Tren Istasyonu Yani 81412 Kartal Istanbul / TR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUCUN, I. Eczacibasi Yapi Gerecleri Sanayi Ve Ticaret Anonim Sirketi Yunus Tren Istasyonu Yani 81412 Kartal/Istanbul / TR | [2005/45] | Representative(s) | Cayli, Hülya, et al Paragon Consultancy Incorporated Koza Sokak No: 63/2 GOP Cankaya 06540 Ankara / TR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | Cayli, Hülya, et al Paragon Consultancy Inc. Koza Sokak No: 60/6 GOP 06700 Ankara / TR | Application number, filing date | 03811577.0 | 20.05.2003 | [2005/45] | WO2003TR00045 | Priority number, date | TR20020002529 | 15.11.2002 Original published format: TR 200202529 | [2005/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004045357 | Date: | 03.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1592332 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1592332 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A47K13/26 | [2005/45] | CPC: |
A47K13/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHARNIERMONTAGEVORRICHTUNG FÜR TOILETTENSCHÜSSELN | [2005/45] | English: | HINGE MOUNTING APPARATUS FOR THE TOILET BOWLS | [2007/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION DE CHARNIERE POUR CUVETTES DE W.-C. | [2005/45] |
Former [2005/45] | HINGE MOUNTING APPARATUS FOR THE PANS | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 05.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/45] | 21.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.09.2007 | CY | 26.09.2007 | CZ | 26.09.2007 | DK | 26.09.2007 | EE | 26.09.2007 | FI | 26.09.2007 | RO | 26.09.2007 | SI | 26.09.2007 | SK | 26.09.2007 | ES | 06.01.2008 | PT | 26.02.2008 | HU | 27.03.2008 | IE | 20.05.2008 | LU | 20.05.2008 | MC | 31.05.2008 | [2010/34] |
Former [2010/32] | AT | 26.09.2007 | |
CY | 26.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2007 | ||
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
EE | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
SI | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
ES | 06.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
IE | 20.05.2008 | ||
LU | 20.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 26.09.2007 | |
CY | 26.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2007 | ||
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
EE | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
SI | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
ES | 06.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
IE | 20.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 26.09.2007 | |
CZ | 26.09.2007 | ||
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
EE | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
SI | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
ES | 06.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
IE | 20.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 26.09.2007 | |
CZ | 26.09.2007 | ||
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
EE | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
ES | 06.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
IE | 20.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 26.09.2007 | |
CZ | 26.09.2007 | ||
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
EE | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
ES | 06.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/04] | AT | 26.09.2007 | |
CZ | 26.09.2007 | ||
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
ES | 06.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 26.09.2007 | |
CZ | 26.09.2007 | ||
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
ES | 06.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 26.09.2007 | |
CZ | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
ES | 06.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | AT | 26.09.2007 | |
CZ | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
ES | 06.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 26.09.2007 | |
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | FI | 26.09.2007 | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP1177756 (CAVAGNA & SIPEX INTERNAT S R L [IT]) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 23 - column 4, line 4; figure - *[A] 3-6 |