EP1573711 - EVENT PROCESSING FOR A NAVIGATION CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2013 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEAR, Eric, Gould, J., c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 02 /
VONG, William, Hong 917 Lake Washington Blvd. S. Seattle, WA 98144 / US | 03 /
KEELY, Leroy, B. 210 Gabarda Way Portola Valley, CA 94028 / US | 04 /
TEASLEY, Barbee, E., c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2007/39] |
Former [2005/37] | 01 /
BEAR, Eric, Gould, J. 3905 132nd Avenue, NE Bellevue, WA 98005 / US | ||
02 /
VONG, William, Hong 917 Lake Washington Blvd. S. Seattle, WA 98144 / US | |||
03 /
KEELY, Leroy, B. 210 Gabarda Way Portola Valley, CA 94028 / US | |||
04 /
TEASLEY, Barbee, E. 651 Prospect Street Leavenworth, WA 98826 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/37] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03811680.2 | 15.12.2003 | [2005/37] | WO2003US40016 | Priority number, date | US20020433914P | 16.12.2002 Original published format: US 433914 P | US20030467367P | 02.05.2003 Original published format: US 467367 P | US20030430990P | 05.05.2003 Original published format: US 430990 P | US20030721536 | 25.11.2003 Original published format: US 721536 | [2005/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004059422 | Date: | 15.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1573711 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.09.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G09G5/00, G06F9/44 | [2007/49] | CPC: |
G06F3/038 (EP);
G06F3/00 (KR);
G06F1/1632 (EP);
G06F3/0238 (EP);
G06F3/0338 (EP);
G06F3/0362 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2005/37] | G09G5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EREIGNISVERARBEITUNG F R EINE NAVIGATIONSSTEUEREINRICHTUNG | [2005/37] | English: | EVENT PROCESSING FOR A NAVIGATION CONTROL DEVICE | [2005/37] | French: | TRAITEMENT D'EVENEMENT POUR UN DISPOSITIF DE CONTROLE DE NAVIGATION | [2005/37] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2004 | Search fee paid | 07.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2004 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 07.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/51] | 02.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.03.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US6040829 (CROY CLEMENS [DE], et al); | [YP]US6526717 (WAGGONER KURT [US], et al) |