EP1563101 - METHOD FOR THE IDENTIFICATION OF SULFO-REDUCING BACTERIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENI S.p.A. Piazzale E. Mattei, 1 00144 Rome / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/18] | For all designated states ENI S.p.A. Piazzale Enrico Mattei 1 00144 Roma / IT | ||
Former [2005/33] | For all designated states ENITECNOLOGIE S.p.A. Via F. Maritano, 26 20097 S. Donato Milanese (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE FERRA, Francesca Corso Mazzini 45 I-26900 Lodi / IT | 02 /
LACATENA, Rosa, Margherita Via dei Volsci 10 I-00185 Rome / IT | [2005/33] | Representative(s) | De Gregori, Antonella Ing. Barzano' & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/33] | De Gregori, Antonella Ing. Barzano' & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 03811765.1 | 17.11.2003 | [2005/33] | WO2003EP13043 | Priority number, date | IT2002MI02479 | 22.11.2002 Original published format: IT MI20022479 | [2005/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004048607 | Date: | 10.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1563101 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1563101 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2005/33] | CPC: |
C12Q1/689 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG SULFOREDUZIERENDER BAKTERIEN | [2007/51] | English: | METHOD FOR THE IDENTIFICATION OF SULFO-REDUCING BACTERIA | [2005/33] | French: | PROCEDE D'IDENTIFICATION DE BACTERIES SULFO-REDUCTRICES | [2005/33] |
Former [2005/33] | VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNGSULFOREDUZIERENDER BAKTERIEN | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/33] | 20.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/14] | Request for further processing for: | 26.09.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 26.09.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.10.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.04.2008 | BE | 23.04.2008 | CY | 23.04.2008 | CZ | 23.04.2008 | DK | 23.04.2008 | EE | 23.04.2008 | FI | 23.04.2008 | IT | 23.04.2008 | NL | 23.04.2008 | RO | 23.04.2008 | SI | 23.04.2008 | SK | 23.04.2008 | TR | 23.04.2008 | BG | 23.07.2008 | SE | 23.07.2008 | DE | 24.07.2008 | GR | 24.07.2008 | ES | 03.08.2008 | PT | 23.09.2008 | HU | 24.10.2008 | IE | 17.11.2008 | LU | 17.11.2008 | CH | 30.11.2008 | LI | 30.11.2008 | MC | 30.11.2008 | [2010/49] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
BE | 23.04.2008 | ||
CY | 23.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
IT | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
TR | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DE | 24.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
HU | 24.10.2008 | ||
IE | 17.11.2008 | ||
LU | 17.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
BE | 23.04.2008 | ||
CY | 23.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
IT | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DE | 24.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
HU | 24.10.2008 | ||
IE | 17.11.2008 | ||
LU | 17.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
BE | 23.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
IT | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DE | 24.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
IE | 17.11.2008 | ||
LU | 17.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
BE | 23.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
IT | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DE | 24.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
IE | 17.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
BE | 23.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
IT | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DE | 24.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
IE | 17.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
BE | 23.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
IT | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DE | 24.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
BE | 23.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DE | 24.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
BE | 23.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DE | 24.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
BE | 23.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
BE | 23.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | NL | 23.04.2008 | |
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/47] | SI | 23.04.2008 | |
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 23.04.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2354072 (ELF EXPLORATION PROD [FR]); | [X] - WAGNER M ET AL, "Phylogeny of dissimilatory sulfite reductase supports an early origin of sulfate respiration", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, vol. 180, no. 11, pages 2975 - 82, XP002243671 [X] 1-10 * page 2975 - page 2976, paragraph 2 * | [DX] - JOULIAN C ET AL, "Congruent phylogenies of most common small-subunit rRNA and dissimilatory sulfite reductase gene sequences retrieved from estuarine sediments", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, vol. 67, no. 7, pages 3314 - 18, XP002243675 [DX] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.67.7.3314-3318.2001 | [Y] - MINZ D ET AL, "Diversity of sulfate-reducing bacteria in oxic and anoxic regions of a microbial mat characterized by comparative analysis of dissimilatory sulfite reductase genes", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, vol. 65, no. 10, pages 4666 - 71, XP002243672 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * | [Y] - LARSEN O ET AL, "A novel organization of the dissimilatory sulfite reductase operon of Thermodesulforhabdus norvegica verified by RT-PCR", FEMS MICROBIOLOGY LETTERS, (20010820), vol. 203, pages 81 - 85, XP002243673 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-1097(01)00337-8 | [Y] - THOMSEN T ET AL, "Biogeochemical and molecular signatures of anaerobic methane oxidation in a marine sediment", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (200104), vol. 67, no. 4, pages 1646 - 56, XP002243674 [Y] 1-10 * page 1648, paragraph 6 - page 1649, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.67.4.1646-1656.2001 |