|
21.03.2014 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2013 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2013 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2013 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2013 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.04.2013 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2013 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2013 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.01.2013 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2013 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
68 |
|
24.01.2013 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2013 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2013 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.12.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2012 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2012 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.01.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.01.2012 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.12.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.12.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2011 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
20.06.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.06.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.05.2011 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2011 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
62 |
|
20.04.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2010 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
10.12.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.12.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.12.2010 |
Invitation to file a translation of the previous application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2010 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.09.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.09.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.08.2010 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.08.2010 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2010 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2010 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2010 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.06.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.06.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.06.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.03.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.03.2010 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
05.03.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.03.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.01.2010 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2009 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2008 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2008 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.08.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.01.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.01.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.10.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.10.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2007 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2007 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2007 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2007 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2007 |
Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.2006 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2006 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2006 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.07.2006 |
Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2005 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2005 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.04.2005 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2005 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
54 |
|
29.06.2004 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.06.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
48 |
|
29.06.2004 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.06.2004 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
29.06.2004 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.06.2004 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.06.2004 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.06.2004 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
68 |