17.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
03.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
19.06.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] |
11.07.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] |
11.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] |
21.03.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 23.04.2014 [2014/17] |
07.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
31.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] |
24.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
03.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.02.2014 [2014/06] |
08.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] |
01.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] |
25.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] |
18.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] |
12.04.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 15.05.2013 [2013/20] |
10.04.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
10.04.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
28.01.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
18.01.2013 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
05.09.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.01.2012 |
Deletion: Date of oral proceedings |
|
18.01.2012 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
18.01.2012 |
Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
23.12.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
06.09.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.06.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
15.04.2011 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.12.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.09.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.07.2010 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 01.09.2010 [2010/35] |
02.03.2010 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
04.09.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.10.2008 |
Change - applicant |
published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] |
29.08.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] |
01.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.02.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.01.2008 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] |
05.10.2007 |
First examination report |
|
02.10.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.09.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.05.2007 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 20.06.2007 [2007/25] |
18.05.2007 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.06.2007 [2007/25] |
09.02.2007 |
Change - inventor |
published on 14.03.2007 [2007/11] |
09.09.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.09.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.07.2005 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 31.08.2005 [2005/35] |
15.07.2005 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 31.08.2005 [2005/35] |
06.07.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.07.2005 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
30.07.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.07.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.07.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.06.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.06.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|