EP1566475 - EXTENSIBLE NONWOVEN FABRIC AND COMPOSITE NONWOVEN FABRIC COMPRISING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 1-5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-7117 / JP | [2015/03] |
Former [2005/34] | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 1-5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-7117 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Kenichi, @Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 580-32 Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0265 / JP | 02 /
MORIMOTO, Hisashi, @Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 580-32 Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0265 / JP | 03 /
HARUBAYASHI, Katsuaki, @Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 580-32 Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0265 / JP | 04 /
MOTOMURA, Shigeyuki, @Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 580-32 Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0265 / JP | 05 /
CHEN, Pingfan Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 580-32 Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0265 / JP | [2015/02] |
Former [2005/34] | 01 /
SUZUKI, Kenichi, Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 580-32 Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0265 / JP | ||
02 /
MORIMOTO, Hisashi, Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 580-32 Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0265 / JP | |||
03 /
HARUBAYASHI, Katsuaki, Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 580-32 Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0265 / JP | |||
04 /
MOTOMURA, Shigeyuki, Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 580-32 Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0265 / JP | |||
05 /
CHEN, Pingfan 580-32 Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0265 / JP | Representative(s) | Wills, Andrew Jonathan, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/03] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2005/34] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 03811919.4 | 25.11.2003 | [2005/34] | WO2003JP15000 | Priority number, date | JP20020341548 | 25.11.2002 Original published format: JP 2002341548 | [2005/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004048661 | Date: | 10.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1566475 | Date: | 24.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1566475 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.06.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | D04H3/00, A61F13/49 | [2005/34] | CPC: |
D04H3/16 (EP,KR,US);
D04H3/007 (KR);
D01F8/06 (KR);
D04H3/14 (EP,US);
Y10T442/601 (EP,US);
Y10T442/602 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CZ, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE, TR [2005/34] | Title | German: | DEHNBARER VLIESSTOFF UND DARAUF BASIERENDER VERBUNDSTOFF | [2005/34] | English: | EXTENSIBLE NONWOVEN FABRIC AND COMPOSITE NONWOVEN FABRIC COMPRISING THE SAME | [2005/34] | French: | TISSU NON TISSE POUVANT ETRE ALLONGE ET TISSU NON TISSE COMPOSITE COMPRENANT CE TISSU NON TISSE LAMINE | [2005/34] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2005 | Translation filed | 12.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2005 | Search fee paid | 12.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/34] | 19.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 04.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.09.2011 | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.01.2015 | BE | 14.01.2015 | ES | 14.01.2015 | FI | 14.01.2015 | IT | 14.01.2015 | NL | 14.01.2015 | PT | 14.01.2015 | SE | 14.01.2015 | TR | 14.01.2015 | GR | 15.04.2015 | [2018/34] |
Former [2017/46] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
BE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
TR | 14.01.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
BE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 14.01.2015 | |
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 14.01.2015 | |
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 14.01.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6417122 (NEWKIRK DAVID D [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7 * column 3, line 16 - column 5, line 25 * [I] 4; | [XP]EP0740714 (BBA NONWOVENS SIMPSONVILLE INC [US], et al) [XP] 1,3,5-7* paragraphs [0007] , [0011] , [0012] , [0014] , [0016] , [0020] , [0023] * | International search | [X]JPH11323716 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC); | [X]JP2002146663 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC); | [A]WO0149908 (BBA NONWOVENS SIMPSONVILLE INC [US], et al) |