EP1570174 - FUEL-INJECTION VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2005/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DANTES, Guenter Karlstr. 20 71735 Eberdingen / DE | 02 /
NOWAK, Detlef Kappishalde 16 74199 Untergruppenbach / DE | 03 /
HEYSE, Joerg Elser-Ring 22 74354 Besigheim / DE | [2005/36] | Representative(s) | Körfer, Thomas Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/26] | Körfer, Thomas Mitscherlich & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03812119.0 | 02.07.2003 | [2005/36] | WO2003DE02210 | Priority number, date | DE2002156667 | 04.12.2002 Original published format: DE 10256667 | [2005/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004051076 | Date: | 17.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1570174 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F02M61/12 | [2005/36] | CPC: |
F02M61/188 (EP,US);
F02M61/12 (EP,US);
F02M61/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/13] |
Former [2005/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BRENNSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL | [2005/36] | English: | FUEL-INJECTION VALVE | [2005/36] | French: | SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT | [2005/36] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/36] | 21.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/32] | 20.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4360162 (ECKERT KONRAD) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]SU1557348 (SARATOVSKIJ I MEKH SELSKOGO KH [SU], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]US5255855 (MAIER STEFAN [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 30 - column 8, line 36; figure 1 *; | [Y]US5285969 (GREINER MAX [DE], et al) [Y] 8,9 * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 62; figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE19623713 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 1 - column 7, line 8; figure 6 *; | [XY]DE19633260 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,10,11 * column 7, line 44 - column 9, line 54; figures 13,20 * [Y] 8,9 | Examination | JP2002317735 |