EP1570641 - WIRELESS CONTROL OF UTILITY ELEMENTS USING RADIO BROADCAST CHANNELS AND METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Singapore Technologies Electronics Ltd. 24 Ang Mo Kio Street 65 Singapore 569061 / SG | [2005/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAY, Leng, Chua Blk 586 Pasir Ris Street 08-65 Singapore 510586 / SG | 02 /
LIM, Chee, Hiong Blk 36 Dover Rise 01-08 Singapore 138685 / SG | 03 /
CHAN, Chue Blk 1F Pine Grove 11-31 Singapore 595001 / SG | 04 /
CHUA, Hian, Koon 28 Woodlands Crescent 07-24 Singapore 738085 / SG | 05 /
TANG, Meng, Meng Blk 173A Punggol Field 12-585 Singapore 821173 / SG | 06 /
CHAN, Kheng, Thong 157E Tamarind Road 01-03 Singapore 806109 / SG | 07 /
WONG, Kok, Ann 15 Woodlands Drive 72 11-42 Singapore 738096 / SG | [2005/36] | Representative(s) | Jannig, Peter, et al Jannig & Repkow Patentanwälte PartG mbB Klausenberg 20 86199 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/36] | Jannig, Peter, et al Jannig & Repkow, Patentanwälte, Klausenberg 20 86199 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03812409.5 | 12.09.2003 | [2005/36] | WO2003SG00218 | Priority number, date | SG20020007318 | 02.12.2002 Original published format: SG 200207318 | [2005/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004051975 | Date: | 17.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1570641 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 17.06.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04M11/00 | [2007/27] | CPC: |
H04Q9/00 (EP);
G08C17/02 (EP);
H04L63/0428 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2005/36] | H04M11/00, H04B14/08, H04L29/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/12] |
Former [2005/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSE STEUERUNG VON VERSORGUNGSELEMENTEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON RUNDFUNKKANÄLEN UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2005/36] | English: | WIRELESS CONTROL OF UTILITY ELEMENTS USING RADIO BROADCAST CHANNELS AND METHOD THEREOF | [2005/36] | French: | COMMANDE SANS FIL D'ELEMENTS D'UTILITAIRES AU MOYEN D'UN CANAL DE DIFFUSION RADIO ET PROCEDE ASSOCIE | [2005/36] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2005 | Search fee paid | 27.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 27.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/36] | 17.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/44] | 15.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9113523 (FLEX PRODUCTS AS [DK]) [X] 1-24 * abstract * * page 3, line 13 - page 5, line 10 * * page 7, line 19 - line 30 * * page 9, line 9 - page 11, line 14 * * page 15, line 7 - line 24 * * page 16, line 5 - page 19, line 9 * * page 23, line 4 - line 13 * * page 28, line 9 - line 20 * * page 29, line 9 - page 31, line 11 * * page 33, line 29 - page 34, line 31 *; | [A]US2002068544 (BARZILAY ZIV [IL], et al) [A] 1-24* the whole document *; | [XP]WO03034570 (TECHNICAL SUPPORT & SUPPLIES L [GB], et al) [XP] 1-24 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US4517562 ; | [X]US4513382 ; | [A]WO0148490 ; | [A]US6285868 |