EP1576204 - AQUEOUS COATING SOLUTIONS AND METHOD FOR THE TREATMENT OF A METAL SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION Limestone Avenue Campbell, ACT 2601 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION Limestone Avenue Campbell, Australian Capital Territory 2601 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLE, Ivan, Stewart 63 Pakington Street Kew, Victoria 3101 / AU | 02 /
FULLSTON, Damian 30 Albert Place Dingley, Victoria 3172 / AU | 03 /
FURMAN, Scott, Anthony 13 Sweet Wattle Drive Cranbourne South, Victoria 3977 / AU | 04 /
MUSTER, Tim, Harvey 2/27 Kionga Street Clayton, Victoria 3168 / AU | 05 /
NEUFELD, Aaron, Kiffer 2/29 Sherwood Avenue Chelsea, Victoria 3196 / AU | 06 /
CHAN, Frankie, Kok, Wai 4 Solway Close Ferntree Gully, Victoria 3156 / AU | 07 /
SHERMAN, Natalie 4/19 Narong Road North Caulfield, Victoria 3161 / AU | [2005/38] | Representative(s) | Frost, Alex John, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/38] | Frost, Alex John, et al Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 03812532.4 | 09.12.2003 | [2005/38] | WO2003AU01644 | Priority number, date | AU20020953190 | 09.12.2002 Original published format: AU 2002953190 | [2005/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004053194 | Date: | 24.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1576204 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 24.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C23C22/48, C23C22/53, C23C22/60, C23C22/68, C09D1/00 | [2005/38] | CPC: |
C09D1/00 (EP,US);
C04B28/24 (EP,US);
C09D5/08 (EP,US);
C23C22/50 (EP,US);
C23C22/52 (EP,US);
C23C22/53 (EP,US);
C23C22/56 (EP,US);
C23C22/57 (EP,US);
C23C26/00 (EP,US);
C23C30/00 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00112 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00525 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B28/24, C04B2103/0021, C04B2103/0025, C04B2103/0067 (US,EP);
C04B28/24, C04B41/4556, C04B2103/0004, C04B2103/61 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGE BESCHICHTUNGSLÖSUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINER METALLOBERFLÄCHE | [2005/38] | English: | AQUEOUS COATING SOLUTIONS AND METHOD FOR THE TREATMENT OF A METAL SURFACE | [2005/38] | French: | SOLUTIONS DE REVETEMENT AQUEUSES ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT D'UNE SURFACE METALLIQUE | [2005/38] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2005 | Search fee paid | 16.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 16.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/38] | 01.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/52] | 11.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2002047578 ; | [X]JPH02125884 ; | [Y]US5068134 (COLE JAMES A [US], et al); | [X]EP0488353 (NIPPON DACRO SHAMROCK CO [JP]); | [X]WO9833856 (ELISHA TECHNOLOGIES CO L L C [US], et al); | [XP]WO03012167 (ELISHA HOLDING LLC [US]); | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 2002-345851, XP008100126 & JP2002047578 A 20020215 (YUKEN KOGYO CO LTD) | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 1990-190215, XP008100127 & JPH02125884 A 19900514 (MORIYA) |