EP1575426 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MEASUREMENT OF ELECTRICAL BIOIMPEDANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tallinn University of Technology Ehitajate tee 5 19086 Tallinn / EE | [2010/45] |
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states Tallinn Technical University Ehitajate tee 5 19086 Tallinn / EE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIN, Mart Sopruse pst 188A-4 13424 Tallinn / EE | 02 /
KINK, Andres Nabala tee 2A, Harjumaa 75401 Kiili / EE | 03 /
LAND, Raul Akadeemia tee 7A-17 12611 Tallinn / EE | 04 /
PARVE, Toomas Rännaku pst 3-7 10917 Tallinn / EE | [2005/38] | Representative(s) | Ostrat, Jaak, et al Lasvet Patent & Trademark Agency Suurtüki 4A 10133 Tallinn / EE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/38] | Ostrat, Jaak, et al Lasvet Patent & Trademark Agency Suurtüki 4A 10133 Tallinn / EE | Application number, filing date | 03812571.2 | 28.11.2003 | [2005/38] | WO2003EE00006 | Priority number, date | EE20020000677 | 06.12.2002 Original published format: EE 200200677 | [2005/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004052198 | Date: | 24.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1575426 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1575426 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/053 | [2010/12] | CPC: |
A61B5/053 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/38] | A61B5/053, G01R27/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MESSUNG DER ELEKTRISCHEN BIOIMPEDANZ | [2005/38] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MEASUREMENT OF ELECTRICAL BIOIMPEDANCE | [2005/38] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE MESURE D'UNE BIO-IMPEDANCE ELECTRIQUE | [2005/38] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/38] | 28.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.12.2010 | BE | 29.12.2010 | CY | 29.12.2010 | CZ | 29.12.2010 | DK | 29.12.2010 | EE | 29.12.2010 | FI | 29.12.2010 | HU | 29.12.2010 | IT | 29.12.2010 | NL | 29.12.2010 | RO | 29.12.2010 | SE | 29.12.2010 | SI | 29.12.2010 | SK | 29.12.2010 | TR | 29.12.2010 | BG | 29.03.2011 | GR | 30.03.2011 | ES | 09.04.2011 | PT | 29.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
IT | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
TR | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
IT | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US5063937 (EZENWA BERTRAM N [US], et al); |