EP1583126 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE TERMINAL CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuji Electric FA Components & Systems Co., Ltd. 1-11-2 Osaki Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0032 / JP | [2008/38] |
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states Fuji Electric FA Components & Systems Co., Ltd. 1-11-2 Osaki Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0032 / JP | ||
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states FUJI ELECTRIC HOLDINGS CO., LTD. 1-1, Tanabeshinden, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-9530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAYA, Kouetsu, c/oFUJI EL. FA Comp. & Sys.Co.LTD 1-11-2, Osaki, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0032 / JP | 02 /
DAIJIMA, Hideki, c/oFUJI EL. FA Comp. & Sys.Co.LTD 1-11-2, Osaki, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0032 / JP | [2005/40] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | Hoffmann, Eckart Bahnhofstrasse 103 D-82166 Gräfelfing / DE | Application number, filing date | 03812674.4 | 22.08.2003 | [2005/40] | WO2003JP10639 | Priority number, date | JP20020359733 | 11.12.2002 Original published format: JP 2002359733 | [2005/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004053912 | Date: | 24.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1583126 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1583126 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.06.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01H45/14, H02B1/20 | [2005/40] | CPC: |
H01R31/085 (EP,US);
H01R13/516 (KR);
H01H50/14 (EP,US);
H01H51/005 (EP,US);
H01H9/0264 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2006/14] |
Former [2005/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANSCHLUSSVERBINDER FÜR ELEKTRONISCHE GERÄTE | [2005/40] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE TERMINAL CONNECTOR | [2005/40] | French: | RACCORD TERMINAL DE DISPOSITIF ELECTRONIQUE | [2005/40] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2005 | Translation filed | 06.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2005 | Search fee paid | 06.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 06.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/40] | 25.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH11122755 ; | [A]DE1959962U (ELEKTROTECHNISCHE FABRIK KUEPP [DE]) [A] 4 * claim 4 *; | [Y]DE2912944 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE) [Y] 3 * figure - *; | [A]AT366854B (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2647272 (FAVERESSE PATRICK [FR]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]CH684721 (SCHRACK COMPONENTS AG [AT]) [A] 1,3 * figure 1 *; | [DXY]ES2081243 (VEGA Y FARRES S A [ES]) [DX] 1,2 * the whole document * [Y] 3; | [PXY]EP1291977 (GE POWER CONTROLS IBERICA S L [ES]) [PX] 1,2 * figure 5 * [PY] 3 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990730), vol. 1999, no. 09, & JP11122755 A 19990430 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYST LTD) [A] 3 * abstract * | International search | [Y]ES2081243 (VEGA Y FARRES S A [ES]); | [Y]JPH11122755 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS); | [Y]JPS5922736Y ; | [Y]JPH08251779 (KYODO KY TEC KK); | [Y]JPH08251781 (KYODO KY TEC KK) |