EP1566814 - ELECTRIC CONTACT MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 21.01.2009 [2009/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shinano Kenshi Kabushiki Kaisha 1078, Ooaza Kamimaruko, Maruko-Machi, Chiisagata-gun Nagano 386-0498 / JP | [2007/29] |
Former [2005/34] | For all designated states Shinano Kenshi Kabushiki Kaisha 1078, Ooaza Kamimaruko, Maruko-Machi, Chiisagata-gun Nagano 386-0498 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKUBO, Masashi, c/o Shinano Kenshi K.K. 1078, Ooaza Kamimaruko, Maruko-machi Chiisagata-gun, Nagano 386-0498 / JP | [2005/34] | Representative(s) | Calderbank, Thomas Roger Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 03812688.4 | 26.11.2003 | [2005/34] | WO2003JP15116 | Priority number, date | JP20020344916 | 28.11.2002 Original published format: JP 2002344916 | [2005/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004053893 | Date: | 24.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1566814 | Date: | 24.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1566814 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.06.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01B1/02, H01B1/24, H01H1/02 | [2005/34] | CPC: |
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
H01H1/027 (EP,US);
H01H2300/036 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/12] |
Former [2005/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROKONTAKTELEMENT | [2005/34] | English: | ELECTRIC CONTACT MEMBER | [2005/34] | French: | ELEMENT DE CONTACT ELECTRIQUE | [2005/34] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2005 | Translation filed | 20.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2005 | Search fee paid | 20.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/34] | 31.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 26.11.2007 | FR | 14.03.2008 | [2009/04] |
Former [2008/32] | FR | 14.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO02059392 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE], et al) [A] 1* claims 1,2 * | International search | [A]JP2002075102 (SHIMADZU CORP, et al); | [A]JP2002341060 (SEIKO INSTR INC); | [A]JP2002341061 (SEIKO INSTR INC); | [AP]JP2003284304 (ANRITSU CORP) |