EP1570510 - FAST LOCALIZATION OF ELECTRICAL FAILURES ON AN INTEGRATED CIRCUIT SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PDF Solutions, Inc. Suite 700, 333 West San Carlos Street San Jose, CA 95110 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/36] | For all designated states PDF Solutions, Inc. Suite 700, 333 West San Carlos Street San Jose, CA 95110 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CIPLICKAS, Dennis 2441 Schubert Avenue San Jose, CA 95124 / US | 02 /
HESS, Christopher 1148 Royal Lane San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | 03 /
LEE, Sherry 935 Wren Drive San Jose, CA 95125 / US | 04 /
WEILAND, Larg, H. 1904 Meadow Glen Drive Livermore, CA 94551 / US | [2007/20] |
Former [2005/36] | 01 /
CIPLICKAS, Dennis 2441 Schubert Avenue San Jose, CA 95124 / US | ||
02 /
HESS, Christopher 320 South Overlook Drive San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | |||
03 /
LEE, Sherry 935 Wren Drive San Jose, CA 95125 / US | |||
04 /
WEILAND, Larg, H. 1904 Meadow Glen Drive Livermore, CA 94551 / US | Representative(s) | Vleck, Jan Montagu Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/36] | Vleck, Jan Montagu Reddie & Grose, 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 03813000.1 | 11.12.2003 | [2005/36] | WO2003US39698 | Priority number, date | US20020432786P | 11.12.2002 Original published format: US 432786 P | [2005/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004053944 | Date: | 24.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1570510 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/20, H01L21/44, H01L21/66, G01R1/04, G01R19/00, G01R31/26, G01R31/28 | [2005/36] | CPC: |
H01L22/20 (EP,US);
G01R31/2884 (EP,US);
H01L22/34 (EP,US);
G01R31/2894 (EP,US);
G01R31/307 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H01L2924/3011 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2006/14] |
Former [2005/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHNELLE LOKALISIERUNG ELEKTRISCHER AUSFûLLE IN EINEMINTEGRIERTEN SCHALTUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN | [2005/36] | English: | FAST LOCALIZATION OF ELECTRICAL FAILURES ON AN INTEGRATED CIRCUIT SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2005/36] | French: | LOCALISATION RAPIDE DE DEFAILLANCES ELECTRIQUES SUR UN SYSTEME DE CIRCUIT INTEGRE ET PROCEDE | [2005/36] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2005 | Search fee paid | 20.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/36] | 19.08.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/53] | 06.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2008 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6258762 (AKIYAMA MOTOHARU [JP]); | [Y]US4912052 (MIYOSHI MOTOSUKE [JP], et al); | [Y]US6475871 (STINE BRIAN E [US], et al); | [Y]US5831446 (SO JASON S [US], et al); | [Y]US6291254 (CHOU SHIH-TSUN ALEXANDER [US], et al); | [Y]US6137303 (DECKERT RICHARD ALLAN [US], et al); | [Y]US6313652 (MAENG JU SEOK [KR]) |