05.11.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] |
23.07.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] |
09.07.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] |
29.01.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] |
27.11.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] |
31.07.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] |
24.07.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] |
19.06.2009 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] |
22.05.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] |
08.05.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2009 [2009/24] |
01.05.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2009 [2009/23] |
10.04.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.05.2009 [2009/20] |
13.03.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] |
06.03.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2009 [2009/15] |
13.02.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2009 [2009/12] |
23.01.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] |
11.07.2008 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] |
05.07.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
05.07.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
29.03.2008 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.11.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.12.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.06.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
17.02.2006 |
Change - extension states |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
24.01.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.11.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.07.2005 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.09.2005 [2005/37] |
29.07.2005 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 14.09.2005 [2005/37] |
20.07.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.07.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.07.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.06.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.07.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.07.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|