EP1573690 - SECURE METHOD FOR MODIFYING DATA RECORDED IN A MEMORY CARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASK S.A. Les Bouillides, 15, Traverse des Brucs, Sophia Antipolis 06560 Valbonne / FR | [2008/33] |
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states ASK S.A. Les Bouillides, 15, Traverse des Brucs, Sophia Antipolis 06560 Valbonne / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PANGAUD, Nicolas Les Vergers des Belles Terres 481, route de Nice F-06560 Valbonne / FR | [2005/37] | Application number, filing date | 03813177.7 | 12.12.2003 | [2005/37] | WO2003FR03696 | Priority number, date | FR20020015740 | 12.12.2002 Original published format: FR 0215740 | [2005/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004055741 | Date: | 01.07.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1573690 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1573690 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/10 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
G07F7/1008 (EP,US);
G06K17/00 (KR);
G06K19/07 (KR);
G06Q20/341 (EP,US);
G07F7/08 (EP,US);
G07F7/082 (EP,US);
G07F7/0833 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERES VERFAHREN ZUM MODIFIZIEREN VON INEINER SPEICHERKARTE AUFGEZEICHNETEN DATEN | [2005/37] | English: | SECURE METHOD FOR MODIFYING DATA RECORDED IN A MEMORY CARD | [2005/37] | French: | PROCEDE SECURISE DE MODIFICATION DE DONNEES ENREGISTREES DANS UNE CARTE A MEMOIRE | [2005/37] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 27.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.08.2008 | CY | 13.08.2008 | CZ | 13.08.2008 | DK | 13.08.2008 | EE | 13.08.2008 | FI | 13.08.2008 | IE | 13.08.2008 | NL | 13.08.2008 | RO | 13.08.2008 | SI | 13.08.2008 | SK | 13.08.2008 | BG | 13.11.2008 | SE | 13.11.2008 | GR | 14.11.2008 | ES | 24.11.2008 | GB | 12.12.2008 | LU | 12.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | HU | 14.02.2009 | [2010/49] |
Former [2010/34] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
CY | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
GB | 12.12.2008 | ||
LU | 12.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
HU | 14.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
GB | 12.12.2008 | ||
LU | 12.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
GB | 12.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
GB | 12.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 13.08.2008 | |
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | NL | 13.08.2008 | |
ES | 24.11.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5987563 (ITOH HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 29 - line 45 *; | [A]FR2798205 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [X]US6236591 (POCKRANDT WOLFGANG [DE]) [X] 1,9 * abstract * * column 5, line 46 - line 56 *; | [X]US2002065978 (MATTISON PHILLIP E [US]) [X] 1,2,9 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0013] * |