23.12.2016 |
Withdrawal of application |
published on 25.01.2017 [2017/04] |
16.12.2016 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
25.08.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.08.2016 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
24.08.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.01.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.10.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.08.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.08.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.08.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.09.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.08.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.06.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.01.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.08.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.10.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
02.09.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.06.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.09.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.05.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
19.04.2007 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.12.2006 |
First examination report |
|
13.12.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.08.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.02.2006 |
Change - extension states |
published on 12.04.2006 [2006/15] |
10.02.2006 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] |
10.02.2006 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] |
03.09.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.08.2005 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.09.2005 [2005/39] |
12.08.2005 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.09.2005 [2005/39] |
05.08.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.07.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.07.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.07.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.07.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.07.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|