EP1572989 - GEN 2.2 DENDRITIC CELL LINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Etablissement Français du Sang 20, Avenue du Stade de France 93218 La Plaine Saint Denis Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/13] | For all designated states Etablissement Francais du Sang 20, Avenue du Stade de France 93218 La Plaine Saint Denis Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states Etablissement Francais du Sang 100, avenue de Suffren 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PLUMAS, Joel 5, rue de la Scierie f-38000 Grenoble / FR | 02 /
CHAPEROT, Dubonnet, Laurence Charriere f-73800 Francin / FR | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Hinterberg, Katherine, et al Cabinet Germain et Maureau, BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [2005/37] | Application number, filing date | 03814483.8 | 16.12.2003 | [2005/37] | WO2003FR03748 | Priority number, date | FR20020015927 | 16.12.2002 Original published format: FR 0215927 | [2005/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004061089 | Date: | 22.07.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1572989 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1572989 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/06, C12N5/08, C12Q1/00, A61K35/12, A61P35/00, A61P37/00 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
C12N5/0639 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61K2035/124 (EP,US);
C12N2501/125 (EP,US);
C12N2501/23 (EP,US);
C12N2501/26 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEN 2.2 DENDRITISCHE ZELL LINIEN | [2005/37] | English: | GEN 2.2 DENDRITIC CELL LINE | [2005/37] | French: | LIGNEE DE CELLULES DENDRITIQUES GEN2.2 | [2005/37] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.06.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 07.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.11.2006 | CZ | 22.11.2006 | EE | 22.11.2006 | FI | 22.11.2006 | IT | 22.11.2006 | NL | 22.11.2006 | RO | 22.11.2006 | SI | 22.11.2006 | SK | 22.11.2006 | TR | 22.11.2006 | MC | 31.12.2006 | BG | 22.02.2007 | DK | 22.02.2007 | SE | 22.02.2007 | GR | 23.02.2007 | ES | 05.03.2007 | PT | 23.04.2007 | HU | 23.05.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/38] | CZ | 22.11.2006 | |
EE | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
RO | 22.11.2006 | ||
SI | 22.11.2006 | ||
SK | 22.11.2006 | ||
TR | 22.11.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
HU | 23.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/32] | CZ | 22.11.2006 | |
EE | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
RO | 22.11.2006 | ||
SI | 22.11.2006 | ||
SK | 22.11.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
HU | 23.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 22.11.2006 | |
EE | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
RO | 22.11.2006 | ||
SI | 22.11.2006 | ||
SK | 22.11.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 22.11.2006 | |
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
RO | 22.11.2006 | ||
SI | 22.11.2006 | ||
SK | 22.11.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | CZ | 22.11.2006 | |
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
RO | 22.11.2006 | ||
SI | 22.11.2006 | ||
SK | 22.11.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | CZ | 22.11.2006 | |
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
RO | 22.11.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/29] | FI | 22.11.2006 | |
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | FI | 22.11.2006 | |
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 |