EP1588050 - WIND GENERATOR OF THE TYPE WITH AUTOMATIC POWER REGULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Travere Industries Sas 27, Bis Impasse Pichon 83140 Six Fours / FR | [2005/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRAVERE, Pierre, Travere Industries SAS 27, Bis Impasse Pichon 83140 Six Fours / FR | [2005/43] | Representative(s) | Pöpping, Barbara, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 52 Rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Pöpping, Barbara, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2005/43] | Doressamy, Clarisse Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 03814488.7 | 23.12.2003 | [2005/43] | WO2003FR03888 | Priority number, date | FR20020016930 | 31.12.2002 Original published format: FR 0216930 | [2005/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004061301 | Date: | 22.07.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1588050 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F03D7/02 | [2005/43] | CPC: |
F03D7/0224 (EP,US);
F05B2260/77 (EP,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WINDERZEUGER MIT AUTOMATISCHER ENERGIEREGELUNG | [2005/43] | English: | WIND GENERATOR OF THE TYPE WITH AUTOMATIC POWER REGULATION | [2005/43] | French: | EOLIENNE DE TYPE A AUTOREGULATION DE PUISSANCE | [2005/43] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/43] | 01.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/02] | 21.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2006 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   21.06.2007 | 31.12.2007 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE3115202 (WORTMANN FRANZ XAVER PROF DR I [DE]) [X] 1-4 * claims 1,7 * * page 4, paragraph 1 - page 5, paragraph 3 * * page 8, paragraph 2 * * figure - * [Y] 5-8; | [Y]DE805388 (KARL SAUER, et al) [Y] 5-8 * page 1, line 31 - line 35; figure 1 *; | [AD]FR1553046 (AEROWATT) [AD] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2506853 (DURANTEAU CAMILLE [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2010980 (FIAT SPA) [A] 1 * abstract * |