EP1577373 - DETERGENT COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAO CORPORATION 14-10, Nihonbashi Kayaba-cho 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | [2006/48] |
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states KAO CORPORATION 14-10, Nihonbashi-Kayabacho 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKURAI, Naoe, c/o KAO CORPORATION RESEARCH LAB. 1-3, BUNKA 2-CHOME SUMIDA-KU, Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | 02 /
TAJIMA, Hitoshi, c/o KAO CORPORATION RESEARCH LAB. 1-3, BUNKA 2-CHOME SUMIDA-KU, Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | [2005/38] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/38] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03814532.2 | 25.09.2003 | [2005/38] | WO2003JP12229 | Priority number, date | JP20020380452 | 27.12.2002 Original published format: JP 2002380452 | [2005/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004061071 | Date: | 22.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1577373 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1577373 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.07.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/33, C11D1/02, A61Q19/10, A61K8/44 | [2006/31] | CPC: |
A61Q5/02 (EP,US);
A61K8/0208 (EP,US);
A61K8/44 (EP,US);
A61K8/442 (EP,US);
A61K8/463 (EP,US);
A61Q11/00 (EP,US);
A61Q19/10 (EP,US);
A61Q5/12 (EP,US);
C11D1/02 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/38] | C11D3/33, C11D1/02, A61K7/50, A61K7/02, A61K7/075, A61K7/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/16] |
Former [2005/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASCHMITTEL | [2005/38] | English: | DETERGENT COMPOSITION | [2005/38] | French: | COMPOSITION DETERGENTE | [2005/38] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2005 | Translation filed | 07.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2005 | Search fee paid | 07.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/38] | 29.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]WO9118588 (CULTOR OY [FI]) [DA] 1-6 * example 18 *; | [A]US5711942 (EICKEN ULRICH [CH], et al) [A] 1-6* column 3, lines 42-46; example -; claim - * | International search | [X]JPH11180855 (KAO CORP); | [X]JP2000038593 (KAO CORP); | [X]JPH07258699 (SUNSTAR INC); | [X]JPS57502166 ; | [X]JPH07258019 (AJINOMOTO KK); | [X]JPH0987126 (AJINOMOTO KK); | [X]JPH11130652 (LION CORP) |