EP1578195 - METASTABLE INSECT REPELLENT EMULSION COMPOSITION AND METHOD OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.06.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AVON PRODUCTS, INC. 1251 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10020-1196 / US | [2005/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GONZALEZ, Anthony, D. 19 Land of Oaks Drive Oak Ridge, NJ 07438 / US | 02 /
PECHKO, Andrew, H. 965 East Ridgewood Avenue Ridgewood, NJ 07450 / US | 03 /
POLYWODA, Vincent, T. 156 Wayne Avenue, POB 1053 Suffern, NY 10901 / US | [2006/52] |
Former [2005/39] | 01 /
GONZALEZ, Anthony, D. 19 Land of Oaks Drive Oak Ridge, NJ 07438 / US | ||
02 /
PECHKO, Andrew, H. 965 East Ridgewood Avenue Ridgewood, NJ 07450 / US | |||
03 /
POLYWODA, Vincent, T. 120 Berkley Square Apartments Suffern, NY 10901 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/39] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03814569.4 | 26.06.2003 | [2005/39] | WO2003US20289 | Priority number, date | US20020334171 | 30.12.2002 Original published format: US 334171 | [2005/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004060063 | Date: | 22.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1578195 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.07.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A01N25/26, A01N25/02, A01N37/18, A01N37/20, A01N65/00 | [2006/24] | CPC: |
A01N37/18 (EP,US);
A01N25/02 (EP,US);
A01N25/04 (EP,US);
A01N37/46 (EP,US);
A01N65/00 (EP,US);
A61K8/06 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A01N25/04, A01N2300/00 (EP,US);
A01N25/04, A01N31/02, A01N37/22, A01N37/46, A01N43/16, A01N43/30, A01N49/00, A01N65/08, A01N65/12, A01N65/28, A01N65/42, A01N65/44 (EP,US);
A01N37/18, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N37/18, A01N25/02 (US,EP);
A01N37/46, A01N2300/00 (EP,US);
A01N37/46, A01N25/02 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2005/39] | A01N25/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/39] | Extension states | AL | 14.01.2005 | LT | 14.01.2005 | LV | 14.01.2005 | MK | 14.01.2005 | Title | German: | METASTABILE EMULSIONSZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR DIE ABWEHR VON INSEKTEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2005/39] | English: | METASTABLE INSECT REPELLENT EMULSION COMPOSITION AND METHOD OF USE | [2005/39] | French: | COMPOSITION D'EMULSION INSECTIFUGE METASTABLE ET PROCEDE D'UTILISATION | [2005/39] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2005 | Search fee paid | 14.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/39] | 15.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.02.2009 | 09.02.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 26.02.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.02.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 11.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/31] | 25.05.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4083966 (BOWELL HAROLD JAMES PERRY) [X] 1-8,10-14,18,19,23 * examples 1,2 *; | [X]US4122029 (GEE RONALD P, et al) [X] 1-14,18-23 * column 2, lines 18-44 * * column 4, lines 44-56 * * column 8, lines 40-61; example 4 *; | [X]US4469675 (CURTIS RALSTON [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10-22 * column 1, lines 26-65 * * column 3, lines 11-15 * * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 28; examples 1-6 *; | [X]DE3508643 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-8,10-22 * page 6, line 18 - page 7, line 3 * * page 8, lines 13-24 * * page 11, lines 11-13,30-36; examples 1-3 *; | [X]US4756905 (MELNIK JOHN [US]) [X] 1-27 * column 2, lines 21-34 * * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 12 * * column 3, lines 34-44; examples 7-12 *; | [X]EP0485207 (RHONE POULENC AGROCHIMIE [FR]) [X] 1-27* pages 2-4 *; | [X]WO9300007 (JOHNSON & SON INC S C [US]) [X] 1-27 * page 2, line 27 - page 3, line 26 * * page 3, line 37; examples 1-5; tables I-IV *; | [DX]WO9742933 (IGUANA L L C [US]) [DX] 1-27 * page 8, lines 6-10 * * page 11, line 6 - page 12, line 18 * * page 14, lines 13-18; examples 1-5 *; | [X]WO0243656 (AVON PROD INC [US], et al) [X] 1-27 * page 2, paragraphs 1,3 * * page 5, paragraphs 1,2 * * examples 1-5 *; | [E]EP1323410 (AVON PROD INC [US]) [E] 1-27 * paragraphs [0006] , [0010] , [0023] - [0028] - [0030]; claim 26 * | International search | [Y]US4127672 (KLIER MANFRED, et al); | [X]US5145604 (NEUMILLER PHILLIP J [US]) |