EP1589978 - DELIVERY SYSTEM FOR FUNCTIONAL COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah WI 54956 / US | ||
Former [2005/44] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LYE, Jason 799 Kirkwood Avenue SE Atlanta, GA 30316 / US | 02 /
MACDONALD, John, Gavin 1472 Knollwood Terrace Decatur, GA 30033 / US | [2005/44] | Representative(s) | Beacham, Annabel Rose, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | Beacham, Annabel Rose, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2009/18] | Davies, Christopher Robert, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/44] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03814766.6 | 11.12.2003 | [2005/44] | WO2003US39737 | Priority number, date | US20020325474 | 20.12.2002 Original published format: US 325474 | US20030731256 | 09.12.2003 Original published format: US 731256 | [2005/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004060378 | Date: | 22.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1589978 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/65, A23L1/236, A61K31/375, A61K9/70, A61K9/00, A61K9/51, A61K9/16, A61K47/48 | [2005/44] | CPC: |
A23L27/32 (EP);
A23L27/77 (EP);
A23L29/015 (EP);
A23P10/30 (EP);
A61K31/197 (EP);
A61K31/375 (EP);
A61K31/57 (EP);
A61K31/65 (EP);
A61K47/50 (KR);
A61K47/6923 (EP);
A61K9/00 (KR);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
B82B1/00 (KR);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/25 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABGABESYSTEM FÜR FUNKTIONELLE VERBINDUNGEN | [2005/44] | English: | DELIVERY SYSTEM FOR FUNCTIONAL COMPOUNDS | [2005/44] | French: | SYSTEME DE DISTRIBUTION POUR COMPOSES FONCTIONNELS | [2005/44] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/44] | 05.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/04] | 11.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/04] | Divisional application(s) | EP12155646.8 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 16.03.2012 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5000746 (MEISS LUDWIG [DE]) [X] 1,3,6 * claims 1,3-5,15 * * column 2, line 10 - column 2, line 53 * * column 3, line 14 - column 3, line 24 *; | [X]EP1214879 (TAKASAGO PERFUMERY CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,6 * claims 1-5 * * paragraphs [0010] , [0017] , [0018] *; | [PX]WO03032959 (BOSCH WILLIAM H [US], et al) [PX] 1,3-9,19,88-94 * claims 1-12 * * page 9, line 1 - page 10, line 26 * * page 11, line 10 - page 23, line 26 * * examples 1-4 *; | [PX]WO03051278 (UNIV NORTH CAROLINA STATE [US], et al) [PX] 1,3,6,19,88,89,92,108,109,111-114 * claims 1,7,8,15,16 * * page 10, line 4 - page 10, line 23 * * page 14, line 1 - page 14, line 23 * * page 15, line 6 - page 15, line 14 * * page 21, line 1 - page 21, line 31 * * page 23, line 15 - page 26, line 27 *; | [PX]US2003203009 (MACDONALD JOHN GAVIN [US]) [PX] 1-3,6,15-17 * paragraphs [0019] - [0026] * * examples 1-3,6 * * claims 35-40 * | [X] - FREY A ET AL, Immunization of mice with peptomers covalently coupled to aluminum oxide nanoparticles, VACCINE, BUTTERWORTH SCIENTIFIC. GUILDFORD, GB, PAGE(S) 3007-3019, (19990806), ISSN 0264-410X, XP004173612 [X] 1,3,6,15,19,88,89,92,97 * abstract * * page 3016, column L, line 21 - page 3016, column L, line 32 * * page 3016, column R, line 24 - page 3016, column R, line 46 * * page 3009, column L, line 26 - page 3009, column R, line 25 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0264-410X(99)00163-2 |