EP1581810 - DEVICES AND METHOD FOR DIRECT ELECTRICAL DETECTION OF MOLECULES AND MOLECULE-MOLECULE INTERACTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.2012 [2012/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oregon Health & Science University 2525 S.W. First Avenue Suite 120 Portland, OR 97201-4753 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states Oregon Health & Science University 2525 S.W. First Avenue , Suite 120 Portland, OR 97201-4753 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VANDENBARK, Arthur A. 2525 SW 1st Avenue, UHS-46 Portland, Oregon 97201 / US | 02 /
SOLANKI, Rajendra 2525 SW 1st Avenue Portland, Oregon 97201 / US | [2005/42] | Representative(s) | Fleuchaus, Michael A., et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechsanwälte Steinerstraße 15/Haus A 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Fleuchaus, Michael A., et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sollner Strasse 36 81479 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/40] | Fleuchaus, Michael A., et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Melchiorstrasse 42 D-81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03815016.5 | 31.12.2003 | [2005/40] | WO2003US41778 | Priority number, date | US20020335043 | 31.12.2002 Original published format: US 335043 | [2005/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004061421 | Date: | 22.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1581810 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.11.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/53, G01N27/02 | [2009/01] | CPC: |
G01N27/3276 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/40] | G01N33/53 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR DIREKTEN ELEKTRISCHEN DETEKTION VON MOLEKÜLEN UND MOLEKÜL-MOLEKÜL-WECHSELWIRKUNGEN | [2005/40] | English: | DEVICES AND METHOD FOR DIRECT ELECTRICAL DETECTION OF MOLECULES AND MOLECULE-MOLECULE INTERACTIONS | [2005/40] | French: | DISPOSITIFS ET PROCEDE DE DETECTION ELECTRIQUE DIRECTE DE MOLECULES ET D'INTERACTIONS ENTRE MOLECULES | [2005/40] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2005 | Search fee paid | 01.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/40] | 13.02.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/06] | 23.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.04.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0543550 (HOUSTON ADVANCED RES CENTER [US], et al) [A] 1-8,14-22 * figures 1-7; claims 1-38 *; | [X]WO9322678 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [X] 1-8,14-22 * figures 4,6,7,9-13,15,22.23 * * page 6, lines 6-20, paragraphs IIIA,B,C,F,H *; | [X]WO0175151 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-8,14-22 * abstract *; | [A]WO0175437 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-8,14-22 * abstract *; | [A]DE10125020 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [A] 1-8,14-22 * abstract ** paragraphs [0013] - [0015] * | International search | [Y]WO9965287 (ORBOTECH LTD [IL], et al); | [Y]US2002090649 (CHAN TONY [US], et al); | [Y] - BATAILLARD ET AL, "Direct detection of immunospecies by capacitance measurements", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (19881101), vol. 60, no. 21, pages 2374 - 2379, XP002039081 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac00172a011 |