EP1594668 - PELLETIZING YEW BIOMASS FOR EXTRACTION OF TAXANES AND OTHER NATURAL PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2009 [2009/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Natural Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 100 Cummings Center, Suite 414G Beverly, MA 01915 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/46] | For all designated states Natural Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 100 Cummings Center, Suite 414G Beverly, MA 01915 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GALLAGHER, Rex, T. 22 Old Towne Road Beverly, MA 01915 / US | 02 /
DESIMONE, Edward, M. 30 East Georgia St., Apt. 313 Indianapolis, IN 46204 / US | 03 /
BUCHER, Brian, A. 907 Boylston Street, Apt. No. 41 Boston, MA 02115 / US | 04 /
HOWE, Christopher, D. 24 South Terrace Beverly, MA 01915 / US | 05 /
HAND, Barry, S. 145 Butternut Hollow Acton, MA 01720 / US | [2007/11] |
Former [2005/46] | 01 /
GALLAGHER, Rex, T. 22 Old Towne Road Beverly, MA 01915 / US | ||
02 /
DESIMONE, Edward, M. 30 East Georgia St., Apt. 313 Indianapolis, IN 46204 / US | |||
03 /
BUCHER, Brian, A. 47 Cherry St., No1 Somerville, MA 02144 / US | |||
04 /
HOWE, Christopher, D. 24 South Terrace Beverly, MA 01915 / US | |||
05 /
HAND, Barry, S. 145 Butternut Hollow Acton, MA 01720 / US | Representative(s) | Crooks, Elizabeth Caroline, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Crooks, Elizabeth Caroline, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2005/49] | Crooks, Elizabeth Caroline, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2005/46] | Hibbert, Juliet Jane Grace, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street GB-London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03815018.1 | 30.12.2003 | [2005/46] | WO2003US41824 | Priority number, date | US20020437434P | 31.12.2002 Original published format: US 437434 P | [2005/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004060626 | Date: | 22.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1594668 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.07.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B29B9/08, B29B11/06, B29B11/12, B29B11/14 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
C07D305/14 (EP);
A61K36/15 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2005/46] | B29B9/00, B29B11/06, B29B11/12, B29B11/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/46] | Extension states | AL | 01.08.2005 | LT | 01.08.2005 | LV | 01.08.2005 | MK | 01.08.2005 | Title | German: | PELLETISIERUNG VON EIBENBIOMASSE ZUR EXTRAKTION VON TAXANEN UND ANDEREN NATURPRODUKTEN | [2005/46] | English: | PELLETIZING YEW BIOMASS FOR EXTRACTION OF TAXANES AND OTHER NATURAL PRODUCTS | [2005/46] | French: | AGGLOMERATION D'UNE BIOMASSE D'IF PERMETTANT L'EXTRACTION DE TAXANES ET D'AUTRES PRODUITS NATURELS | [2005/46] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2005 | Search fee paid | 01.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/46] | 01.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/32] | 24.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2008 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4941948 (YAMAMOTO JUNSABURO [JP]) [Y] 1-21 * claim 1 *; | [Y]US5393896 (MARGRAFF RODOLPHE [FR]) [Y] 1-21 * column 3, line 17 - line 68 *; | [Y]WO9634973 (SAMYANG GENEX CO LTD [KR], et al) [Y] 1-21 * claims 2,3 *; | [DY]US6375447 (ZITRON ZAIMAN [US], et al) [DY] 1-21* the whole document *; | [Y] - RAO K V ET AL, "Taxanes from the bark of Taxus brevifolia", PHYTOCHEMISTRY, PERGAMON PRESS, GB, (199804), vol. 47, no. 7, ISSN 0031-9422, pages 1315 - 1324, XP004293895 [Y] 1-21 * page 1320, column 2, paragraph 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0031-9422(97)00722-X | International search | [X]US5942241 ; | [XP]US6514516 |