EP1585929 - EQUIPMENT FOR RECEIVING A WEAPON IN PARTICULAR A LIGHT WEAPON SUCH AS A HAND WEAPON FOR A BENCH TEST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.2006 [2006/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sogesta Z.I. du Loup Pendu, Boîte postale 61260 14406 Bayeux / FR | [2005/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEVILLY, Philippe André Jean Le Bas du bourg, D 31 F-14240 Cormolain / FR | [2005/42] | Representative(s) | Cabinet HERRBURGER 67 avenue Niel 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/42] | Cabinet HERRBURGER 115, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 03815114.8 | 15.12.2003 | [2005/42] | WO2003FR03718 | Priority number, date | FR20020015898 | 16.12.2002 Original published format: FR 0215898 | [2005/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004063656 | Date: | 29.07.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1585929 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F41A23/16 | [2005/42] | CPC: |
F41A23/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG ZUR AUFNAHME EINER WAFFE, INSBESONDERE EINERLEICHTEN WAFFE WIE EINE HANDWAFFE FÜR EINEN PRÜFSTANDVERSUCH | [2005/42] | English: | EQUIPMENT FOR RECEIVING A WEAPON IN PARTICULAR A LIGHT WEAPON SUCH AS A HAND WEAPON FOR A BENCH TEST | [2005/42] | French: | EQUIPEMENT DE RECEPTION D'UNE ARME NOTAMMENT DE PETIT CALIBRE TELLE QU'UNE ARME DE POING POUR UN BANC DE TEST | [2005/42] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/42] | 01.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/52] | 10.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/52] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2005 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5070636 (MUELLER EVAN [US]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]US5375337 (BUTLER TERRY L [US]) [A] 1,9 * column 3, line 15 - column 4, line 40; figure - *; | [A]DE20018006U (THALHAMMER FRANZ [DE]) [A] 1,9 * abstract *; | [A]DE20018009U (THALHAMMER FRANZ [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO0173368 (BRIOL THOMAS [DE]) [A] 1,9 * figures 3-5 * |