EP1696193 - WOODWORKING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/35] | WOODWORKING METHOD AND DEVICE | ||
[2010/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OOO "Polistek" 2 Karatscharowskij pr. 4A Moskau 109391 / RU | [2010/21] |
Former [2006/35] | For all designated states Bodrov, Youri Vasilevich ul. Junykh Lenintsev, 77-3-44 Moscow, 109443 / RU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bodrov, Youri Vasilevich str. Yunih Leninzew h. 77, c.3 ap. 44 Moscow / RU | [2010/21] |
Former [2006/35] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Theobald, Andreas, et al PATERIS Patentanwälte PartmbB Postfach 08 03 05 10003 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/04] | Theobald, Andreas, et al PATERIS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 08 03 05 10003 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2006/35] | Theobald, Andreas, et al Rothkopf Theobald Elbel Postfach 08 03 05 10003 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 03815336.7 | 25.11.2003 | [2006/35] | WO2003RU00523 | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005052478 | Date: | 09.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1696193 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1696193 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 09.06.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B27K1/00, B27K1/02, B27K5/00, F26B3/04, F26B7/00, F26B21/06, F26B21/12, F26B25/12 | [2007/14] | CPC: |
F26B21/06 (EP);
B27K5/009 (EP);
F26B3/04 (EP);
F26B2210/16 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/35] | F26B3/04, F26B9/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOLZBEHANDLUNGSMETHODE | [2010/27] | English: | WOODWORKING METHOD | [2010/27] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE BOIS | [2010/27] |
Former [2006/35] | HOLZBEHANDLUNGSMETHODE UND -VORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2006/35] | WOODWORKING METHOD AND DEVICE | ||
Former [2006/35] | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE BOIS | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2004 | Translation filed | 27.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2004 | Search fee paid | 27.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 19.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/44] | 15.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 19.09.2006 | M01   Fee paid on   19.09.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 26.01.2011 | CZ | 26.01.2011 | DK | 26.01.2011 | EE | 26.01.2011 | FI | 26.01.2011 | HU | 26.01.2011 | IE | 26.01.2011 | NL | 26.01.2011 | RO | 26.01.2011 | SE | 26.01.2011 | SI | 26.01.2011 | SK | 26.01.2011 | TR | 26.01.2011 | BG | 26.04.2011 | GR | 27.04.2011 | ES | 07.05.2011 | PT | 26.05.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
CZ | 26.01.2011 | ||
DK | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
RO | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
SK | 26.01.2011 | ||
TR | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
CZ | 26.01.2011 | ||
DK | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
RO | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
SK | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
DK | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/39] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | SE | 26.01.2011 | |
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB477742 (HENRI MARIE ANDRE VAUTHERIN) [X] 1-11 * page 2, lines 7-27; claim 1 *; | [X]GB703722 (MAPA AG) [X] 1-11 * page 1, lines 45-60,69-75; claims 1,2 *; | [X]DE2441855 (JOERGENSEN NIELS VALDEMAR VEST) [X] 12-21 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]GB2005816 (CHAMPION INT CORP) [A] 12-21* page 5, lines 46-49 *; | [X]FR2644855 (CEAF SPA [IT]) [X] 12-21 * figures 1,2; claims 1,2 *; | [X]WO0011421 (LIM WEE HOU [SG]) [X] 12-21 * page 11, lines 1-15; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]EP1291143 (YAMAHA CORP [JP]) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0040]; claim 1 * | International search | [A]RU2030698 (SMIRNOV ALEKSEJ ALEKSANDROVICH [RU]); | [A]DE2913881 (PAGNOZZI); | [A]FR2644855 (CEAF SPA [IT]); | [A]DE2441855 (JOERGENSEN NIELS VALDEMAR VEST) | by applicant | SU719870 | GB703722 | EP1291143 | SU1250460 | RU2023963 | SU94719 |